VT S0200 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-05 - Signed by Governor on May 16, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-05 - Signed by Governor on May 16, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Pharmacy Audits, Reimbursement For Ambulance Services, And The Reporting Requirements Of Health Insurers
Title
An Act Relating To Pharmacy Audits, Reimbursement For Ambulance Services, And The Reporting Requirements Of Health Insurers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-05 | Signed by Governor on May 16, 2012 | |
2012-05-04 | As passed by Senate and House | |
2012-05-04 | Committee of Conference report adopted | |
2012-05-04 | Committee of Conference report submitted by Senator McCormack for Committee, text | |
2012-05-04 | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Campbell | |
2012-05-04 | House message House adopted Conference Committee report | |
2012-05-04 | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton | |
2012-05-04 | Committee of Conference report agreed to (Senate bill) | |
2012-05-01 | House message House appointed Conference Committee members | |
2012-05-01 | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton | |
2012-05-01 | Speaker appointed Copeland-Hanzas of Bradford, Pearson of Burlington and Komline of Dorset as members of the Committee of Conference on the part of the House | |
2012-05-01 | Senate Message, House proposal of amendment not concurred in and committee of conference appointed | |
2012-05-01 | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Campbell | |
2012-04-30 | Committee of Conference appointed: Senators McCormack, Westman, and Pollina | |
2012-04-28 | House proposal of amendment not concurred in; Committee of Conference requested, on motion of Senator Cummings | |
2012-04-28 | House proposal of amendment; text | |
2012-04-28 | Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment | |
2012-04-27 | New Business/House Proposal of Amendment | |
2012-04-26 | Entered on Notice Calendar | |
2012-04-25 | House message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment | |
2012-04-25 | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton | |
2012-04-25 | Read Third time and Passed in Concurrence with Proposal of Amendment | |
2012-04-24 | Amendment of Rep. Wizowaty of Burlington ruled not germane | |
2012-04-25 | Reps. Wizowaty of Burlington, Burke of Brattleboro, Buxton of Tunbridge, Courcelle of Rutland City, Davis of Washington, Edwards of Brattleboro, Ellis of Waterbury, Evans of Essex, Hooper of Montpelier, Krowinski of Burlington, Lanpher of Vergennes, Manwaring of Wilmington, Martin of Wolcott, Miller of Shaftsbury, O'Sullivan of Burlington, Pearson of Burlington, Ram of Burlington, Stuart of Brattleboro, Taylor of Barre City, Waite-Simpson of Essex, and Webb of Shelburne moved to amend the House proposal of amendment | |
2012-04-25 | Rep. Copeland-Hanzas of Bradford moved to amend the House proposal of amendment which was agreed to | |
2012-04-24 | Third Reading Ordered | |
2012-04-24 | Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 69 of 136 to Pass -- Yeas = 135, Nays = 1 | |
2012-04-24 | Proposal of Amendment of the Committee on Health Care agreed to | |
2012-04-24 | Rep. Copeland-Hanzas of Bradford reported for the committee on Health Care Reform Commission | |
2012-04-24 | Read Second Time | |
2012-04-03 | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Health Care | |
2012-03-29 | Read 3rd time & passed | |
2012-03-29 | New Business/Third Reading | |
2012-03-28 | 3rd reading ordered | |
2012-03-28 | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare agreed to | |
2012-03-28 | Reported favorably by Senator Westman for Committee on Finance | |
2012-03-28 | Read second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Pollina for Committee on Health and Welfare | |
2012-03-28 | New Business/Second Reading | |
2012-03-27 | Favorable report by Committee on Finance | |
2012-03-27 | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onHealth and Welfare | |
2012-03-27 | Entered on Notice Calendar | |
2012-03-16 | Rules suspended & bill committed to Committee on Finance with the report of Committee on Health and Welfare intact, on motion of Senator Cummings | |
2012-03-16 | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Campbell | |
2012-03-16 | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onHealth and Welfare | |
2012-03-16 | Entered on Notice Calendar | |
2012-01-03 | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Health and Welfare |