VT S0198 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-23 - Signed by Governor on May 23, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-23 - Signed by Governor on May 23, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to the Government Accountability Committee and the annual report on the State’s population-level outcomes
Title
An act relating to the Government Accountability Committee and the annual report on the State’s population-level outcomes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-23 | Senate | Signed by Governor on May 23, 2016 |
2016-05-19 | Senate | Delivered to Governor on May 19, 2016 |
2016-05-05 | Senate | As passed by Senate and House |
2016-05-05 | Senate | House message House passed bill in concurrence |
2016-05-03 | House | Read Third time and Passed in Concurrence |
2016-05-02 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2016-05-02 | House | Rep. Evans of Essex reported for the committee on Government Operations |
2016-05-02 | House | Read Second Time |
2016-02-09 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Government Operations |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Senator Ashe requested & granted leave to withdraw amendment |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Pending third reading, Senator(s) Ashe moved to amend bill |
2016-02-04 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2016-02-03 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations agreed to |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Collamore for Committee on Government Operations |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2016-02-03 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onGovernment Operations |
2016-01-05 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Government Operations |