VT S0197 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-11 - Senate Message, allowed to become law without Governor's signature on May 11, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-11 - Senate Message, allowed to become law without Governor's signature on May 11, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to the provision of mental health supports
Title
An act relating to the provision of mental health supports
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-11 | House | Senate Message, allowed to become law without Governor's signature on May 11, 2022 |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Allowed to become law without signature of Governor on May 11, 2022 |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Delivered to Governor on May 5, 2022 |
2022-04-27 | Senate | As passed by Senate and House |
2022-04-27 | Senate | House message: House passed bill in concurrence |
2022-04-22 | House | Read Third time and passed in concurrence |
2022-04-22 | House | Action Calendar: Third reading |
2022-04-21 | House | Third Reading ordered |
2022-04-21 | House | Rep. Scheu of Middlebury recommended for the Committee on Appropriations |
2022-04-21 | House | Rep. Austin of Colchester reported for the Committee on Education |
2022-04-21 | House | Read Second time |
2022-04-21 | House | Action Calendar: Favorable |
2022-04-20 | House | Notice Calendar: Favorable |
2022-04-19 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a) |
2022-04-19 | House | Notice Calendar: Favorable |
2022-03-29 | House | Read First Time and referred to the Committee on Education |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed |
2022-03-24 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2022-03-23 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare agreed to |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Baruth for Committee on Appropriations |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Lyons for Committee on Health and Welfare |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Appropriations |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Appropriations |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2022-03-22 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Appropriations |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31 |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2022-01-05 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Health and Welfare |