VT S0195 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-04 - Recommitted to Committee on Health and Welfare on motion of Senator Lyons
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-04 - Recommitted to Committee on Health and Welfare on motion of Senator Lyons
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to the certification of mental health peer support specialists
Title
An act relating to the certification of mental health peer support specialists
Sponsors
Sen. Cheryl Hooker [D] | Sen. Virginia Lyons [D] | Sen. Thomas Chittenden [D] | Sen. Ruth Hardy [D] |
Sen. Andrew Perchlik [D] | Sen. Anthony Pollina [D] | Sen. Kesha Ram Hinsdale [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-04 | Senate | Recommitted to Committee on Health and Welfare on motion of Senator Lyons |
2022-05-04 | Senate | House proposal of amendment; text |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2022-05-02 | Senate | New Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2022-04-29 | Senate | House Proposal of Amendment |
2022-04-28 | Senate | House message: House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2022-04-27 | House | Read Third time and passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2022-04-27 | House | Action Calendar: Third reading |
2022-04-26 | House | Third Reading ordered |
2022-04-26 | House | Report of Committee on Health Care agreed to |
2022-04-26 | House | Rep. Burrows of West Windsor reported for the Committee on Health Care |
2022-04-26 | House | Read Second time |
2022-04-26 | House | Action Calendar: Favorable with amendment |
2022-04-22 | House | Notice Calendar: Favorable with amendment |
2022-03-31 | House | Read First Time and referred to the Committee on Health Care |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed |
2022-03-29 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2022-03-25 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare, as amended, agreed to |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare amended as recommended by Committee on Appropriations |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Westman for Committee on Appropriations with recommendation of amendment |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Pearson for Committee on Finance |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Hooker for Committee on Health and Welfare |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Appropriations |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Finance |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Appropriations |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Finance |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Appropriations |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Finance |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2022-03-23 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Appropriations |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Finance |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31 |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Finance |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance per Senate Rule 31 |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2022-01-05 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Health and Welfare |