VT S0195 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-10 - Senate Message, Signed by Governor May 27, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-10 - Senate Message, Signed by Governor May 27, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Increasing The Penalties For Second Or Subsequent Convictions For Disorderly Conduct, And Creating A New Crime Of Aggravated Disorderly Conduct
Title
An Act Relating To Increasing The Penalties For Second Or Subsequent Convictions For Disorderly Conduct, And Creating A New Crime Of Aggravated Disorderly Conduct
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-10 | House | Senate Message, Signed by Governor May 27, 2014 |
2014-05-10 | Senate | Signed by Governor on May 27, 2014 |
2014-05-10 | Senate | Delivered to Governor on May 22, 2014 |
2014-05-07 | Senate | As passed by Senate and House |
2014-05-07 | Senate | House message House passed bill in concurrence |
2014-05-05 | House | Passed in Concurrence |
2014-05-05 | House | Read Third time |
2014-05-02 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2014-05-02 | House | Amendment of Committee on Judiciary agreed to |
2014-05-02 | House | Rep. Conquest of Newbury reported for the committee on Judiciary |
2014-05-02 | House | Read Second Time |
2014-03-21 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Judiciary |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed |
2014-03-18 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2014-03-14 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary agreed to |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Read second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Benning for Committee on Judiciary |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary |
2014-03-14 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onJudiciary |
2014-01-07 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary |