VT S0191 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-05-27 - Unfinished Business/Third Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to tax increment financing districts

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to tax increment financing districts

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-27SenateUnfinished Business/Third Reading
2020-05-26SenateUnfinished Business/Third Reading
2020-05-22SenateUnfinished Business/Third Reading
2020-05-21SenateUnfinished Business/Third Reading
2020-05-20SenateUnfinished Business/Third Reading
2020-05-19SenateUnfinished Business/Third Reading
2020-05-14SenateUnfinished Business/Third Reading
2020-05-12SenateUnfinished Business/Third Reading
2020-05-07SenateUnfinished Business/Third Reading
2020-05-05SenateUnfinished Business/Third Reading
2020-05-04SenateUnfinished Business/Third Reading
2020-05-01SenateUnfinished Business/Third Reading
2020-04-29SenateUnfinished Business/Third Reading
2020-04-27SenateUnfinished Business/Third Reading
2020-04-24SenateUnfinished Business/Third Reading
2020-04-23SenateUnfinished Business/Third Reading
2020-04-22SenateUnfinished Business/Third Reading
2020-04-20SenateUnfinished Business/Third Reading
2020-04-17SenateUnfinished Business/Third Reading
2020-04-16SenateUnfinished Business/Third Reading
2020-04-14SenateUnfinished Business/Third Reading
2020-04-11SenateUnfinished Business/Third Reading
2020-04-10SenateUnfinished Business/Third Reading
2020-04-09SenateUnfinished Business/Third Reading
2020-04-08SenateUnfinished Business/Third Reading
2020-04-07SenateUnfinished Business/Third Reading
2020-04-06SenateUnfinished Business/Third Reading
2020-04-03SenateUnfinished Business/Third Reading
2020-04-01SenateUnfinished Business/Third Reading
2020-03-30SenateUnfinished Business/Third Reading
2020-03-27SenateUnfinished Business/Third Reading
2020-03-24SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2020-03-13Senate3rd reading ordered
2020-03-13SenateRecommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance agreed to
2020-03-13SenateRead second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Cummings for Committee on Finance
2020-03-13SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance
2020-03-13SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2020-03-12SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance
2020-03-12SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2020-01-07SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Finance

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback