VT S0188 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-12 - Senate Message, signed by Governor May 31, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-12 - Senate Message, signed by Governor May 31, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to regulating licensed small cannabis cultivation as farming
Title
An act relating to regulating licensed small cannabis cultivation as farming
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-12 | House | Senate Message, signed by Governor May 31, 2022 |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Signed by Governor on May 31, 2022 |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Delivered to Governor on May 25, 2022 |
2022-05-11 | House | Senate Message, House proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment to House proposal of amendment concurred in |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Rules suspended & ordered delivered to Governor forthwith, on motion of Senator Balint |
2022-05-11 | Senate | As passed by Senate and House |
2022-05-11 | Senate | House proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment concurred in |
2022-05-11 | Senate | House proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment, text |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Balint |
2022-05-11 | Senate | House proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2022-05-10 | Senate | House message: House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment to House proposal of amendment, with further proposal of amendment |
2022-05-10 | House | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney |
2022-05-10 | House | Senate proposal of amendment to House proposal of amendment concurred in with further amendment thereto, as offered by Rep. O'Brien of Tunbridge and Partridge of Windham, as amended |
2022-05-10 | House | Which was agreed to |
2022-05-10 | House | Rep. Gannon of Wilmington moved to amend the House proposal of amendment offered by Rep. O'Brien of Tunbridge and Partridge of Windham |
2022-05-10 | House | Rep. O'Brien of Tunbridge and Partridge of Windham moved to concur with the Senate proposal of amendment to the House proposal of amendment with a further amendment thereto |
2022-05-10 | House | Senate proposal of amendment considered |
2022-05-10 | House | Action Calendar: Senate proposal of amendment |
2022-05-09 | House | Rep. O'Brien of Tunbridge moved to postpone action until May 10, 2022 which was agreed to |
2022-05-09 | House | Action Calendar: Senate proposal of amendment |
2022-05-07 | House | Notice Calendar: Senate proposal of amendment |
2022-05-07 | House | Senate Message, House proposal of amendment concurred in with further amendment thereto |
2022-05-06 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Mazza |
2022-05-06 | Senate | Proposal of amendment agreed to |
2022-05-06 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Senator(s) Pearson; text |
2022-05-06 | Senate | House proposal of amendment; text |
2022-05-06 | Senate | New Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2022-05-05 | Senate | House message: House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment |
2022-05-05 | Senate | House Proposal of Amendment |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2022-05-04 | House | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney |
2022-05-04 | House | Read Third time and passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2022-05-04 | House | Action Calendar: Third reading |
2022-05-03 | House | Third Reading ordered |
2022-05-03 | House | Report of Committee on Agriculture and Forestry as amended agreed to |
2022-05-03 | House | Report of the Committee on Agriculture and Forestry amended as recommended by the Committee on Ways and Means |
2022-05-03 | House | Rep. Elder of Starksboro recommended for the Committee on Ways and Means |
2022-05-03 | House | Rep. O'Brien of Tunbridge reported for the Committee on Agriculture and Forestry |
2022-05-03 | House | Read Second time |
2022-05-03 | House | Action Calendar: Favorable with amendment |
2022-05-02 | House | Action Calendar: Favorable with amendment |
2022-04-29 | House | Notice Calendar: Favorable with amendment |
2022-04-22 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means per Rule 35(a) |
2022-03-22 | House | Read First Time and referred to the Committee on Agriculture and Forestry |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Third Reading |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Third Reading |
2022-03-15 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2022-03-11 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Agriculture agreed to |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Pearson for Committee on Finance |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Pearson for Committee on Agriculture |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Finance |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Agriculture |
2022-03-11 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Finance |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Agriculture |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance per Senate Rule 31 |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Agriculture |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2022-01-04 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Agriculture |