VT S0187 | 2023-2024 | Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-10 - Senate Message: Signed by Governor May 6, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-10 - Senate Message: Signed by Governor May 6, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to student application of sunscreen
Title
An act relating to student application of sunscreen
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-10 | House | Senate Message: Signed by Governor May 6, 2024 |
2024-05-06 | Senate | Signed by Governor on May 6, 2024 |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Delivered to Governor on April 30, 2024 |
2024-04-23 | Senate | As passed by Senate and House |
2024-04-23 | Senate | House message: House passed bill in concurrence |
2024-04-19 | House | Read third time and passed in concurrence |
2024-04-19 | House | Action Calendar: Third Reading |
2024-04-18 | House | Third Reading ordered |
2024-04-18 | House | Rep. Brady of Williston reported for the Committee on Education |
2024-04-18 | House | Read second time |
2024-04-18 | House | Action Calendar: Favorable |
2024-04-17 | House | Notice Calendar: Favorable |
2024-03-14 | House | Read first time and referred to the Committee on Education |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Title amended as recommended by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed |
2024-03-12 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2024-03-01 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare agreed to |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Weeks for Committee on Health and Welfare |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2024-03-01 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Committee on Transportation relieved; bill committed to Committee on Health and Welfare on motion of Senator Perchlik |
2024-01-03 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Transportation |