VT S0187 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-12 - Signed by Governor on October 12, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-12 - Signed by Governor on October 12, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to transient occupancy for health care treatment and recovery
Title
An act relating to transient occupancy for health care treatment and recovery
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-12 | Senate | Signed by Governor on October 12, 2020 |
2020-10-06 | Senate | Delivered to Governor on October 6, 2020 |
2020-09-23 | Senate | As passed by Senate and House |
2020-09-23 | Senate | House proposal of amendment concurred in |
2020-09-23 | Senate | House proposal of amendment; text |
2020-09-23 | Senate | Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2020-09-22 | Senate | Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2020-09-21 | Senate | Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2020-09-19 | Senate | Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2020-09-18 | Senate | Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2020-09-17 | Senate | Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2020-09-16 | Senate | New Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2020-09-15 | Senate | House message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment |
2020-09-15 | Senate | House Proposal of Amendment |
2020-09-15 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2020-09-10 | House | Read Third time and Passed in Concurrence with Proposal of Amendment |
2020-09-09 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2020-09-09 | House | Report of Committee on General, Housing, and Military Affairs agreed to. |
2020-09-09 | House | Rep. Gonzalez of Winooski reported for the committee on General, Housing, and Military Affairs |
2020-09-09 | House | Read Second Time |
2020-09-02 | House | Rep. Pugh of South Burlington moved that the committee on Human Services be relieved of the bill and that the same be committed to the committee on General, Housing, and Military Affairs which was agreed to. |
2020-03-25 | House | Referred to the Committee on Human Services |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed |
2020-03-12 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs agreed to |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Read second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Hooker for Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs |
2020-03-13 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs |
2020-03-12 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2020-01-07 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs |