VT S0184 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-10 - Senate Message, Signed by Governor June 17, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-10 - Senate Message, Signed by Governor June 17, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Law Enforcement Policies On Eyewitness Identification And Bias-free Policing And On Recording Of Custodial Interrogations In Homicide And Sexual Assault Cases
Title
An Act Relating To Law Enforcement Policies On Eyewitness Identification And Bias-free Policing And On Recording Of Custodial Interrogations In Homicide And Sexual Assault Cases
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-05 - House - Shall the amendment offered by Rep. Lippert of Hinesburg be substituted for the amendment offered by Rep. Kilmartin of Newport City? (Y: 93 N: 34 NV: 1 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2014-05-01 - House - Shall the House propose to the Senate to amend the bill as recommended by the committee on Judiciary? (Y: 138 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-05-01 - House - Shall the House propose to the Senate to amend the bill as recommended by the committee on Judiciary? (Y: 138 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-10 | House | Senate Message, Signed by Governor June 17, 2014 |
2014-05-10 | Senate | Signed by Governor on June 17, 2014 |
2014-05-10 | Senate | Delivered to Governor on June 12, 2014 |
2014-05-10 | Senate | As passed by Senate and House |
2014-05-10 | Senate | House message House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment to House proposal of amendment |
2014-05-09 | House | Senate Proposal of Amendment concurred in |
2014-05-09 | House | Rep. Turner of Milton moved to suspend rules and take up bill for immediate consideration |
2014-05-08 | House | Senate message passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Baruth |
2014-05-08 | Senate | House proposal of amendment concurred in with proposal of amendment, on motion of Senator Sears |
2014-05-08 | Senate | House proposal of amendment; text |
2014-05-08 | Senate | House Proposal of Amendment |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Sears |
2014-05-07 | Senate | House Proposal of Amendment |
2014-05-06 | Senate | House message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment |
2014-05-05 | House | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Savage of Swanton |
2014-05-05 | House | Passed in Concurrence with Proposal of Amendment |
2014-05-05 | House | Read Third time |
2014-05-05 | House | Amendment as offered by Rep. Lippert of Hinesburg agreed to |
2014-05-05 | House | Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 64 of 127 to Pass -- Yeas = 93, Nays = 34 |
2014-05-05 | House | Rep. Lippert of Hinesburg moved to substitute an amendment for the amendment offered by Rep. Kilmartin of Newport City which was agreed to |
2014-05-05 | House | Rep. Kilmartin of Newport City moved to amend the bill |
2014-05-02 | House | Rep. Lippert of Hinesburg moved to postpone action until May 5, 2014 which was agreed to |
2014-05-01 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2014-05-01 | House | Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 71 of 141 to Pass -- Yeas = 138, Nays = 3 |
2014-05-01 | House | Amendment of Committee on Judiciary agreed to |
2014-05-01 | House | Rep. Kilmartin of Newport City asked that the question be divided |
2014-05-01 | House | Rep. Rep. Grad of Moretown reported for the committee on Judiciary |
2014-05-01 | House | Read Second Time |
2014-04-30 | House | Rep. Waite-Simpson of Essex moved to postpone action until May 1, 2014 which was agreed to |
2014-04-23 | House | Rep. Grad of Moretown moved to commit bill to the committee on Judiciary which was agreed to. |
2014-02-11 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Judiciary |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed |
2014-02-06 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2014-02-05 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment agreed to |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Read second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Ashe for Committee on Judiciary |
2014-02-05 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onJudiciary |
2014-01-07 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary |