VT S0183 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-21 - Senate Message, signed by Governor April 21, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-21 - Senate Message, signed by Governor April 21, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to midpoint probation review
Title
An act relating to midpoint probation review
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Sears [D] | Sen. Jeanette White [D] | Sen. Philip Baruth [D] | Sen. Joseph Benning [R] |
Sen. Alice Nitka [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-21 | House | Senate Message, signed by Governor April 21, 2022 |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Signed by Governor on April 21, 2022 |
2022-04-15 | Senate | Delivered to Governor on April 15, 2022 |
2022-04-08 | House | Senate Message, House proposal of amendment concurred in |
2022-04-07 | Senate | As passed by Senate and House |
2022-04-07 | Senate | House proposal of amendment concurred in |
2022-04-07 | Senate | House proposal of amendment; text |
2022-04-07 | Senate | New Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2022-04-06 | Senate | House message: House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment |
2022-04-06 | Senate | House Proposal of Amendment |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2022-04-01 | House | Read Third time and passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2022-03-31 | House | Action Calendar: Third reading |
2022-03-31 | House | Third Reading ordered |
2022-03-31 | House | Rep. Morgan, M. of Milton moved to amend the bill which was agreed to |
2022-03-31 | House | Rep. Morgan, M. of Milton reported for the Committee on Corrections and Institutions |
2022-03-31 | House | Read Second time |
2022-03-31 | House | Action Calendar: Favorable |
2022-03-30 | House | Notice Calendar: Favorable |
2022-01-26 | House | Read First Time and referred to the Committee on Corrections and Institutions |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed |
2022-01-25 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2022-01-21 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment agreed to |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator White for Committee on Judiciary |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary |
2022-01-21 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2022-01-04 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary |