VT S0179 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-05 - Signed by Governor on May 9, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-05 - Signed by Governor on May 9, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Amending Perpetual Conservation Easements
Title
An Act Relating To Amending Perpetual Conservation Easements
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-05 | Signed by Governor on May 9, 2012 | |
2012-05-05 | Delivered to Governor on May 8, 2012 | |
2012-04-18 | As passed by Senate and House | |
2012-04-19 | House proposal of amendment concurred in | |
2012-04-19 | House proposal of amendment; text | |
2012-04-18 | Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment | |
2012-04-17 | Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment | |
2012-04-16 | Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment | |
2012-04-13 | New Business/House Proposal of Amendment | |
2012-04-12 | House Proposal of Amendment | |
2012-04-12 | Entered on Notice Calendar | |
2012-04-11 | House message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment | |
2012-04-10 | Read Third time and Passed in Concurrence with Proposal of Amendment | |
2012-04-10 | Amendment as offered by Rep. Krebs of South Hero agreed to | |
2012-04-06 | Third Reading Ordered | |
2012-04-06 | Proposal of Amendment of the Committee on Natural Resources and Energy agreed to | |
2012-04-05 | Rep. Rep. Ellis of Waterbury reported for the committee on Natural Resources and Energy | |
2012-04-06 | Read Second Time | |
2012-03-30 | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Energy | |
2012-03-29 | Read 3rd time & passed | |
2012-03-28 | Unfinished Business/Third Reading | |
2012-03-27 | New Business/Third Reading | |
2012-03-23 | 3rd reading ordered | |
2012-03-23 | Recommendation of amendment, as amended agreed to | |
2012-03-23 | Recommendation of amendment by Senator Benning on behalf of Committee on Natural Resources and Energy agreed to | |
2012-03-23 | Read second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Benning for Committee on Natural Resources and Energy | |
2012-03-23 | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy | |
2012-03-23 | Unfinished Business/Second Reading | |
2012-03-22 | Unfinished Business/Second Reading | |
2012-03-21 | Unfinished Business/Second Reading | |
2012-03-20 | New Business/Second Reading | |
2012-03-16 | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onNatural Resources and Energy | |
2012-03-16 | Entered on Notice Calendar | |
2012-01-03 | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Natural Resources and Energy |