VT S0171 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-04 - Senate Message, signed by Governor May 3, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-04 - Senate Message, signed by Governor May 3, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to adoption of a State code of ethics
Title
An act relating to adoption of a State code of ethics
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-04 | House | Senate Message, signed by Governor May 3, 2022 |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Signed by Governor on May 3, 2022 |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Delivered to Governor on April 27, 2022 |
2022-04-20 | House | Senate Message, House proposal of amendment concurred in |
2022-04-19 | Senate | As passed by Senate and House |
2022-04-19 | Senate | House proposal of amendment concurred in |
2022-04-19 | Senate | House proposal of amendment; text |
2022-04-19 | Senate | New Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2022-04-15 | Senate | House message: House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment |
2022-04-15 | Senate | House Proposal of Amendment |
2022-04-15 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2022-04-13 | House | Read Third time and passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2022-04-13 | House | Action Calendar: Third reading |
2022-04-12 | House | Third Reading ordered |
2022-04-12 | House | Report of Committee on Government Operations agreed to |
2022-04-12 | House | Rep. Gannon of Wilmington reported for the Committee on Government Operations |
2022-04-12 | House | Read Second time |
2022-04-12 | House | Action Calendar: Favorable with amendment |
2022-04-08 | House | Notice Calendar: Favorable with amendment |
2022-03-25 | House | Read First Time and referred to the Committee on Government Operations |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Third Reading |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Third Reading |
2022-03-18 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2022-03-17 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations agreed to |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Pollina for Committee on Government Operations |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2022-03-15 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2022-01-04 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Government Operations |