VT S0169 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - Read First Time and referred to the Committee on Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - Read First Time and referred to the Committee on Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to education property tax overpayments by a municipality or school district
Title
An act relating to education property tax overpayments by a municipality or school district
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-18 | House | Read First Time and referred to the Committee on Ways and Means |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed |
2022-02-16 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2022-02-15 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Appropriations agreed to |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance agreed to |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Kitchel for Committee on Appropriations with recommendation of amendment |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Cummings for Committee on Finance |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Appropriations |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance |
2022-02-15 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Appropriations |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31 |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2022-01-04 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Finance |