VT S0169 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Senate message, Vetoed by Governor June 10, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to firearms procedures

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to firearms procedures

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-15 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 71 of 140 to Pass -- Yeas = 82, Nays = 58 (Y: 82 N: 58 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - House - Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 71 of 140 to Pass -- Yeas = 46, Nays = 94 (Y: 46 N: 94 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2019-05-15 - House - Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 72 of 142 to Pass -- Yeas = 49, Nays = 93 (Y: 49 N: 93 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2019-05-15 - House - Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 70 of 139 to Pass -- Yeas = 50, Nays = 89 (Y: 50 N: 89 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2019-05-15 - House - Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 69 of 137 to Pass -- Yeas = 56, Nays = 81 (Y: 56 N: 81 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2019-03-21 - Senate - 3rd reading ordered on roll call, requested by Senator Sears, Passed -- Needed 16 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 20, Nays = 10 (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Senate - Roll Call, requested by Senator Baruth,  Failed -- Needed 16 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 10, Nays = 20 (Y: 10 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-29HouseSenate message, Vetoed by Governor June 10, 2019
2019-06-10SenateGovernor vetoed bill on June 10, 2019
2019-06-04SenateDelivered to Governor on June 4, 2019
2019-05-20SenateAs passed by Senate and House
2019-05-20SenateHouse message House passed bill in concurrence
2019-05-16HouseRead Third time and Passed in Concurrence
2019-05-15HouseThird Reading Ordered
2019-05-15HouseRoll Call Results Passed -- Needed 71 of 140 to Pass -- Yeas = 82, Nays = 58
2019-05-15HouseWhich was disagreed to
2019-05-15HouseRoll Call Results Failed -- Needed 71 of 140 to Pass -- Yeas = 46, Nays = 94
2019-05-15HouseRep. Donahue of Northfield moved to commit the bill to the committee on Health Care
2019-05-15HouseWhich was disagreed to
2019-05-15HouseRoll Call Results Failed -- Needed 72 of 142 to Pass -- Yeas = 49, Nays = 93
2019-05-15HouseRep. Brennan of Colchester moved to propose to the Senate to amend the bill
2019-05-15HouseWhich was disagreed to
2019-05-15HouseRoll Call Results Failed -- Needed 70 of 139 to Pass -- Yeas = 50, Nays = 89
2019-05-15HouseRep. Bancroft of Westford moved to propose to the Senate to amend the bill
2019-05-15HouseWhich was disagreed to
2019-05-15HouseRoll Call Results Failed -- Needed 69 of 137 to Pass -- Yeas = 56, Nays = 81
2019-05-15HouseRep. McFaun of Barre Town, Anthony of Barre City, and LaClair of Barre Town moved to propose to the Senate to amend the bill
2019-05-15HouseWhich was disagreed to
2019-05-15HouseRep. Brennan of Colchester moved to propose to the Senate to amend the bill
2019-05-15HouseRep. Savage of Swanton asked and was granted leave to withdraw amendment
2019-05-15HouseRep. Savage of Swanton moved to propose to the Senate to amend the bill
2019-05-15HouseRep. LaLonde of South Burlington reported for the committee on Judiciary
2019-05-15HouseRead Second Time
2019-03-27HouseRead First Time and Referred to the Committee on Judiciary
2019-03-22SenateRead 3rd time & passed
2019-03-22SenateRecommendation of amendment agreed to
2019-03-22SenatePending third reading, motion to amend bill offered by Senator(s) Sears
2019-03-22SenateRecommendation of amendment agreed to
2019-03-22SenatePending third reading, motion to amend bill offered by Senator(s) McNeil
2019-03-22SenatePending third reading, motion to amend to be offered by Senator(s) McNeil
2019-03-22SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2019-03-21Senate3rd reading ordered on roll call, requested by Senator Sears, Passed -- Needed 16 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 20, Nays = 10
2019-03-21SenateRoll Call, requested by Senator Baruth,  Failed -- Needed 16 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 10, Nays = 20
2019-03-21SenateRecommendation of amendment disagreed to
2019-03-21SenateRecommendation of amendment by Senator(s) Collamore, text
2019-03-21SenateRecommendation of amendment agreed to
2019-03-21SenateRecommendation of amendment by Senator(s) Rodgers, text
2019-03-21SenateRecommendation of amendment agreed to
2019-03-21SenateRecommendation of amendment by Senator(s) Sears, text
2019-03-21SenateRead 2nd time
2019-03-21SenateRecommendation of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Rodgers
2019-03-21SenateRecommendation of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Sears
2019-03-21SenateCommittee Bill for Second Reading
2019-03-20SenateCommittee Bill for Second Reading
2019-03-19SenateCommittee bill read first time & placed on Notice Calendar per Senate Rule 48

Vermont State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://legislature.vermont.gov/bill/status/2020/S.169
Texthttps://legislature.vermont.gov/Documents/2020/Docs/BILLS/S-0169/S-0169%20As%20Introduced.pdf
Texthttps://legislature.vermont.gov/Documents/2020/Docs/BILLS/S-0169/S-0169%20As%20passed%20by%20the%20Senate%20Official.pdf
Texthttps://legislature.vermont.gov/Documents/2020/Docs/BILLS/S-0169/S-0169%20As%20Passed%20by%20Both%20House%20and%20Senate%20Official.pdf
Roll Callhttps://legislature.vermont.gov/bill/roll-call/2020/35
Roll Callhttps://legislature.vermont.gov/bill/roll-call/2020/36
Roll Callhttps://legislature.vermont.gov/bill/roll-call/2020/98
Roll Callhttps://legislature.vermont.gov/bill/roll-call/2020/99
Roll Callhttps://legislature.vermont.gov/bill/roll-call/2020/100
Roll Callhttps://legislature.vermont.gov/bill/roll-call/2020/101
Roll Callhttps://legislature.vermont.gov/bill/roll-call/2020/102

Bill Comments

feedback