VT S0169 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-28 - Committed to the Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs on motion of Senator Illuzzi
Pending: Senate Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-28 - Committed to the Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs on motion of Senator Illuzzi
Pending: Senate Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Workers' Compensation Liens
Title
An Act Relating To Workers' Compensation Liens
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-28 | Committed to the Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs on motion of Senator Illuzzi | |
2012-04-28 | Unfinished Business/Second Reading | |
2012-04-27 | Unfinished Business/Second Reading | |
2012-04-26 | Unfinished Business/Second Reading | |
2012-04-25 | Recommendation of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Illuzzi | |
2012-04-25 | Unfinished Business/Second Reading | |
2012-04-24 | Recommendation of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Illuzzi | |
2012-04-24 | Unfinished Business/Second Reading | |
2012-04-23 | Unfinished Business/Second Reading | |
2012-04-21 | Unfinished Business/Second Reading | |
2012-04-20 | Consideration postponed; Second reading | |
2012-04-19 | Consideration postponed to next legislative day on motion of Senator Ashe | |
2012-04-19 | Point of order sustained by the President | |
2012-04-19 | Point of order raised by Senator Snelling on ground that proposed amendment was not germane | |
2012-04-19 | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Ashe for Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs | |
2012-04-19 | Recommendation of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Illuzzi | |
2012-04-19 | Unfinished Business/Second Reading | |
2012-04-18 | Unfinished Business/Second Reading | |
2012-04-17 | Unfinished Business/Second Reading | |
2012-04-16 | New Business/Second Reading | |
2012-04-13 | Recommendation of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Illuzzi | |
2012-04-13 | Entered on Notice Calendar | |
2012-04-12 | Committee on Rules relieved of further consideration of the bill on motion of Senator Campbell | |
2012-03-30 | Committed to Committee on Rules with report of Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs intact, under suspension of Senate Rule 49, on motion of Senator Campbell | |
2012-03-30 | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onAppropriations | |
2012-03-30 | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onEconomic Development, Housing and General Affairs | |
2012-03-30 | Entered on Notice Calendar | |
2012-03-20 | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31 | |
2012-03-20 | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onEconomic Development, Housing and General Affairs | |
2012-03-20 | Entered on Notice Calendar | |
2012-01-03 | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs |
Vermont State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.vt.us/database/status/summary.cfm?Bill=S.0169&Session=2012 |
Text | http://www.leg.state.vt.us/docs/2012/bills/Intro/S-169.pdf |