VT S0168 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-20 - Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on General, Housing, and Military Affairs
Pending: House General, Housing and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-20 - Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on General, Housing, and Military Affairs
Pending: House General, Housing and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to employment protection for volunteer emergency responders
Title
An act relating to employment protection for volunteer emergency responders
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-20 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on General, Housing, and Military Affairs |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed |
2018-03-15 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2018-03-14 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Recommendation of Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs, as amended, agreed to |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Motion agreed to |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Senator(s) Soucy motion to substitute amendment for Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs recommendation of amendment; text |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Read second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Soucy for Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs |
2018-03-14 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onEconomic Development, Housing and General Affairs |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2018-01-03 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs |