VT S0168 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-10 - Senate Message, Signed by Governor May 28, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-10 - Senate Message, Signed by Governor May 28, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Making Miscellaneous Amendments To Laws Governing Municipalities
Title
An Act Relating To Making Miscellaneous Amendments To Laws Governing Municipalities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-10 | House | Senate Message, Signed by Governor May 28, 2014 |
2014-05-10 | Senate | Signed by Governor on May 28, 2014 |
2014-05-10 | Senate | Delivered to Governor on May 22, 2014 |
2014-05-08 | House | Senate Message, Passed in Concurrence |
2014-05-06 | Senate | As passed by Senate and House |
2014-05-06 | Senate | House proposal of amendment concurred in |
2014-05-06 | Senate | House proposal of amendment; text |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Baruth |
2014-05-06 | Senate | House message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment |
2014-05-05 | House | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Savage of Swanton |
2014-05-05 | House | Passed in Concurrence with Proposal of Amendment |
2014-05-05 | House | Read Third time |
2014-05-02 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2014-05-02 | House | Amendment of Committee on Government Operations agreed to |
2014-05-02 | House | Read Second Time |
2014-05-02 | House | Rep. Mook of Bennington reported for the committee on Government Operations |
2014-03-21 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Government Operations |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Division of the Senate Yeas 8, Nays 20 |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Motion disagreed to |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Pending third reading, Senator(s) Hartwell moved to amend bill |
2014-03-19 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2014-03-18 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations agreed to |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Read second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator French for Committee on Government Operations |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2014-03-18 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onGovernment Operations |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Recommitted to Committee on Government Operations on motion of Senator French |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment to be offered by Senator Galbraith |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment to be offered by Senator French |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Pending Question: Shall the recommendation of Government Operations be amended as moved by Sen. Benning? |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Consideration postponed to February 26, 2014 |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Consideration postponed to February 26, 2014 on motion of Senator White |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Senator Benning moved to strike out Subsection (c) of 17 VSA 2651d, in Sec. 6 of amendment of the Committee on Government Operations |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations amended as moved by Senator Sears |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Read second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator French for Committee on Government Operations |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2014-02-18 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onGovernment Operations |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Government Operations |