VT S0166 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 3 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-05-21 - Delivered to Governor on May 21, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to the provision of medication-assisted treatment for inmates

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to the provision of medication-assisted treatment for inmates

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-21SenateDelivered to Governor on May 21, 2018
2018-05-07SenateAs passed by Senate and House
2018-05-07SenateHouse message House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment to House proposal of amendment
2018-05-04HouseSenate Proposal of Amendment concurred in
2018-05-04HouseRules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton
2018-05-03HouseSenate message, House proposal of amendment concurred in with further amendment thereto
2018-05-03SenateRules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe
2018-05-03SenateHouse proposal of amendment concurred in with further proposal of amendment as moved by Senator(s) Rodgers
2018-05-03SenateSenator Rodgers moved to concur in House proposal of amendment with proposal of amendment; text
2018-05-03SenateHouse proposal of amendment; text
2018-05-03SenateProposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Rodgers
2018-05-03SenateNew Business/House Proposal of Amendment
2018-05-01SenateHouse message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment
2018-05-02SenateProposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Rodgers
2018-05-02SenateHouse Proposal of Amendment
2018-05-02SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2018-04-27HouseRead Third time and Passed in Concurrence with Proposal of Amendment
2018-04-26HouseThird Reading Ordered
2018-04-26HouseReport of Committee on Corrections and Institutions as amended agreed to
2018-04-26HouseReport of the Committee on Corrections and Institutions amended as recommended by the Committee on Appropriations
2018-04-26HouseRep. Hooper of Montpelier recommended for the committee on Appropriations
2018-04-26HouseRep. Shaw of Pittsford reported for the committee on Corrections and Institutions
2018-04-26HouseRead Second Time
2018-04-17HouseRep. Emmons of Springfield moved to commit bill to the committee on Appropriations which was agreed to.
2018-03-16HouseRead First Time and Referred to the Committee on Corrections and Institutions
2018-03-14SenateRead 3rd time & passed
2018-03-14SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2018-03-13Senate3rd reading ordered
2018-03-13SenateRecommendation of amendment by Committee on Institutions agreed to
2018-03-13SenateRead second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Rodgers for Committee on Institutions
2018-03-13SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Institutions
2018-03-13SenateUnfinished Business/Second Reading
2018-03-02SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Institutions
2018-03-02SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2018-03-01SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onInstitutions
2018-03-01SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2018-01-03SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Institutions

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback