VT S0165 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-11 - Signed by Governor on May 10, 2010
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-11 - Signed by Governor on May 10, 2010
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Waiver Of The Statute Of Limitations In Criminal Prosecutions
Title
An Act Relating To Waiver Of The Statute Of Limitations In Criminal Prosecutions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-11 | Signed by Governor on May 10, 2010 | |
2010-05-04 | Delivered to Governor on May 4, 2010 | |
2010-04-29 | Rules suspended & ordered delivered to Governor forthwith, on motion of Senator Shumlin | |
2010-04-29 | As passed by Senate and House | |
2010-04-29 | Title amended as proposed by the House proposal of amendment | |
2010-04-29 | House proposal of amendment concurred in | |
2010-04-29 | New Business/House Proposal of Amendment | |
2010-04-28 | House Proposal of Amendment | |
2010-04-27 | House message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment | |
2010-04-27 | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Nease of Johnson | |
2010-04-27 | Read Third time and Passed in Concurrence with Proposal of Amendment | |
2010-04-23 | Third Reading Ordered | |
2010-04-23 | Proposal of Amendment of the Committee on Judiciary agreed to | |
2010-04-23 | Rep. Jewett of Ripton reported for the committee on Judiciary | |
2010-04-23 | Read Second Time | |
2010-02-03 | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Judiciary | |
2010-01-29 | Read 3rd time & passed | |
2010-01-29 | New Business/Third Reading | |
2010-01-26 | 3rd reading ordered | |
2010-01-26 | Recommendation of amendment agreed to | |
2010-01-26 | Read second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Campbell for Committee on Judiciary | |
2010-01-26 | New Business/Second Reading | |
2010-01-22 | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onJudiciary | |
2010-01-05 | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary |