VT S0164 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-01 - Signed by Governor on May 1, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-01 - Signed by Governor on May 1, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to establishing the Unused Prescription Drug Repository Program
Title
An act relating to establishing the Unused Prescription Drug Repository Program
Sponsors
Sen. Claire Ayer [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-01 | Senate | Signed by Governor on May 1, 2018 |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Delivered to Governor on April 25, 2018 |
2018-04-19 | House | Senate Message, House proposal of amendment concurred in |
2018-04-18 | Senate | As passed by Senate and House |
2018-04-18 | Senate | House proposal of amendment concurred in |
2018-04-18 | Senate | House proposal of amendment; text |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2018-04-13 | Senate | House message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment |
2018-04-17 | Senate | New Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2018-04-13 | Senate | House Proposal of Amendment |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2018-04-11 | House | Read Third time and Passed in Concurrence with Proposal of Amendment |
2018-04-10 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2018-04-10 | House | Report of Committee on Human Services agreed to. |
2018-04-10 | House | Rep. Pajala of Londonderry reported for the committee on Human Services |
2018-04-10 | House | Read Second Time |
2018-02-15 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Human Services |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed |
2018-02-09 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare agreed to |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Read second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Ayer for Committee on Health and Welfare |
2018-02-13 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2018-02-09 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onHealth and Welfare |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2018-01-03 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Health and Welfare |