VT S0163 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 24 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-24 - Signed by Governor on 2/24/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 24 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-24 - Signed by Governor on 2/24/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Technical Corrections To 2009 Sex Offender Legislation
Title
An Act Relating To Technical Corrections To 2009 Sex Offender Legislation
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-24 | Signed by Governor on 2/24/10 | |
2010-03-18 | Delivered to Governor on 2/18/10 | |
2010-02-16 | As passed by Senate and House | |
2010-02-16 | House proposal of amendment concurred in | |
2010-02-16 | Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment | |
2010-02-12 | Consideration postponed without objection | |
2010-02-12 | New Business/House Proposal of Amendment | |
2010-02-10 | House Proposal of Amendment | |
2010-02-10 | House message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment | |
2010-02-05 | Read Third time and Passed in Concurrence with Proposal of Amendment | |
2010-02-04 | Third Reading Ordered | |
2010-02-04 | Proposal of Amendment of the Committee on Judiciary agreed to | |
2010-02-04 | Read Second Time | |
2010-02-04 | Rep. Lippert of Hinesburg reported for the committee on Judiciary | |
2010-01-20 | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Judiciary | |
2010-01-15 | Read 3rd time & passed | |
2010-01-15 | New Business/Third Reading | |
2010-01-12 | 3rd reading ordered | |
2010-01-12 | Motion to amend bill agreed to | |
2010-01-12 | Senator Campbell, on behalf of Committee on Judiciary, moved to amend bill; text | |
2010-01-12 | Read 2nd time | |
2010-01-12 | Recommendation of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Campbell | |
2010-01-12 | Committee Bill for Second Reading | |
2010-01-08 | Committee Bill for Second Reading | |
2010-01-05 | Committee bill read first time & placed on Notice Calendar per Senate Rule 48 |