VT S0161 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-12 - Signed by Governor on May 14, 2010
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act Relating To National Crime Prevention And Privacy Compact

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Relating To National Crime Prevention And Privacy Compact

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-05-12 Signed by Governor on May 14, 2010
2010-05-04 Rules suspended & ordered delivered to Governor forthwith, on motion of Senator Shumlin
2010-05-04 As passed by Senate and House
2010-05-04 House proposal of amendment concurred in
2010-05-04 House proposal of amendment; text
2010-05-04 New Business/House Proposal of Amendment
2010-05-03 House Proposal of Amendment
2010-05-03 House message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment
2010-04-29 Read Third time and Passed in Concurrence with Proposal of Amendment
2010-04-28 Third Reading Ordered
2010-04-28 Proposal of Amendment of the Committee on Judiciary agreed to
2010-04-28 Rep. Lippert of Hinesburg reported for the committee on Judiciary
2010-04-28 Read Second Time
2010-02-03 Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Judiciary
2010-01-29 Read 3rd time & passed
2010-01-29 New Business/Third Reading
2010-01-26 3rd reading ordered
2010-01-26 Reported favorably by Senator Sears for Committee on Judiciary
2010-01-26 Read 2nd time
2010-01-26 New Business/Second Reading
2010-01-22 Favorable report by Committee on Judiciary
2010-01-05 Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback