VT S0160 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Senate Message, Signed by Governor June 20, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to agricultural development

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to agricultural development

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-29HouseSenate Message, Signed by Governor June 20, 2019
2019-06-20SenateSigned by Governor on June 20, 2019
2019-06-17SenateDelivered to Governor on June 17, 2019
2019-05-23SenateRules suspended & ordered delivered to Governor forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe
2019-05-23SenateAs passed by Senate and House
2019-05-23SenateCommittee of Conference report adopted
2019-05-23SenateCommittee of Conference report submitted by Senator Pearson for Committee, text
2019-05-23SenateRules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Ashe
2019-05-23HouseSenate message, report of committee of conference adopted
2019-05-23SenateCommittee of Conference Report
2019-05-23SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2019-05-22SenateHouse message House adopted Conference Committee report
2019-05-22HouseRules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney
2019-05-22HouseCommittee of Conference report adopted (Senate bill)
2019-05-22HouseRules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney
2019-05-17HouseSpeaker appointed Bartholomew of Hartland, Bock of Chester and Strong of Albany as members of the Committee of Conference on the part of the House
2019-05-17HouseSenate Message, House proposal of amendment not concurred in and committee of conference appointed
2019-05-20SenateHouse message House appointed Conference Committee members
2019-05-17SenateRules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe
2019-05-17SenateCommittee of Conference appointed: Senators Pearson, Hardy, and Pollina
2019-05-17SenateHouse proposal of amendment not concurred in; Committee of Conference requested, on motion of Senator Starr
2019-05-17SenateHouse proposal of amendment; text
2019-05-17SenateRules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Starr
2019-05-17SenateHouse message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment
2019-05-17HouseRules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney
2019-05-17HouseRead Third time and Passed in Concurrence with Proposal of Amendment
2019-05-17HouseRep. Masland of Thetford asked and was granted leave to withdraw amendment
2019-05-17HouseRep. Masland of Thetford and Briglin of Thetford moved that the House propose to the Senate to amend the bill
2019-05-16HouseThird Reading Ordered
2019-05-16HouseReport of Committee on Agriculture and Forestry as amended agreed to
2019-05-16HouseReport of the Committee on Agriculture and Forestry amended as offered by Rep. Partridge of Windham
2019-05-16HouseReport of the Committee on Agriculture and Forestry amended as recommended by the Committee on Appropriations
2019-05-16HouseReport of the Committee on Agriculture and Forestry amended as recommended by the Committee on Ways and Means
2019-05-16HouseRep. Conquest of Newbury recommended for the committee on Appropriations
2019-05-16HouseRep. Masland of Thetford recommended for the committee on Ways and Means
2019-05-16HouseRep. Partridge of Windham reported for the committee on Agriculture and Forestry
2019-05-16HouseRead Second Time
2019-05-13HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a)
2019-05-08HouseReferred to Committee on Ways and Means per Rule 35(a)
2019-04-03HouseRead First Time and Referred to the Committee on Agriculture and Forestry
2019-03-29SenateRead 3rd time & passed
2019-03-29SenateUnfinished Business/Third Reading
2019-03-28SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2019-03-27Senate3rd reading ordered
2019-03-27SenateRecommendation of amendment by Committee on Appropriations agreed to
2019-03-27SenateRecommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance agreed to
2019-03-27SenateReported favorably by Senator Starr for Committee on Appropriations with recommendation of amendment
2019-03-27SenateReported favorably by Senator Pearson for Committee on Finance with recommendation of amendment
2019-03-27SenateRead 2nd time
2019-03-27SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Appropriations
2019-03-27SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance
2019-03-27SenateCommittee Bill for Second Reading
2019-03-26SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Appropriations
2019-03-26SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance
2019-03-26SenateCommittee Bill for Second Reading
2019-03-26SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2019-03-22SenateReferred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31
2019-03-22SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance
2019-03-22SenateCommittee Bill for Second Reading
2019-03-22SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2019-03-19SenateReferred to Committee on Finance per Senate Rule 31
2019-03-19SenateRules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Ashe
2019-03-19SenateCommittee bill read first time & placed on Notice Calendar per Senate Rule 48

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback