VT S0148 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-05 - Signed by Governor on May 14, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-05 - Signed by Governor on May 14, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Expediting Development Of Small And Micro Hydroelectric Projects
Title
An Act Relating To Expediting Development Of Small And Micro Hydroelectric Projects
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-05 | Signed by Governor on May 14, 2012 | |
2012-05-05 | Delivered to Governor on May 10, 2012 | |
2012-04-30 | As passed by Senate and House | |
2012-04-30 | House proposal of amendment concurred in | |
2012-04-30 | House proposal of amendment; text | |
2012-04-30 | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Campbell | |
2012-04-30 | House Proposal of Amendment | |
2012-04-30 | Entered on Notice Calendar | |
2012-04-28 | House message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment | |
2012-04-27 | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Savage of Swanton | |
2012-04-27 | Read Third time and Passed in Concurrence with Proposal of Amendment | |
2012-04-26 | Third Reading Ordered | |
2012-04-26 | Proposal of Amendment of the Committee on Fish, Wildlife & Water Resources agreed to | |
2012-04-25 | Rep. Rep. Krebs of South Hero reported for the committee on Fish, Wildlife & Water Resources | |
2012-04-26 | Read Second Time | |
2012-03-23 | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Fish, Wildlife & Water Resources | |
2012-03-21 | Read 3rd time & passed | |
2012-03-21 | New Business/Third Reading | |
2012-03-20 | 3rd reading ordered | |
2012-03-20 | Read second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator McCormack for Committee on Natural Resources and Energy | |
2012-03-20 | Unfinished Business/Second Reading | |
2012-03-16 | New Business/Second Reading | |
2012-03-15 | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onNatural Resources and Energy | |
2012-03-15 | Entered on Notice Calendar | |
2012-01-03 | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Natural Resources and Energy |