VT S0138 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 4 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-04 - Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Campbell
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on May 4 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-04 - Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Campbell
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Calculation Of Criminal Sentences And Record Keeping For Search Warrants
Title
An Act Relating To Calculation Of Criminal Sentences And Record Keeping For Search Warrants
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-04 | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Campbell | |
2012-05-04 | House proposal of amendment concurred in with further proposal of amendment as moved by Senator(s) Sears | |
2012-05-04 | House proposal of amendment; text | |
2012-05-03 | Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment | |
2012-04-30 | House Proposal of Amendment | |
2012-04-30 | Entered on Notice Calendar | |
2012-04-28 | House message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment | |
2012-04-28 | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Savage of Swanton | |
2012-04-28 | Read Third time and Passed in Concurrence with Proposal of Amendment | |
2012-04-28 | Amendment as offered by Rep. Donahue of Northfield agreed to | |
2012-04-27 | Third Reading Ordered | |
2012-04-27 | Proposal of Amendment of the Committee on Judiciary agreed to | |
2012-04-26 | Rep. Rep. Keenan of St. Albans City, recommended for the committee on Appropriations | |
2012-04-26 | Rep. Rep. Lippert of Hinesburg reported for the committee on Judiciary | |
2012-04-27 | Read Second Time | |
2012-04-24 | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a) | |
2012-03-30 | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Judiciary | |
2012-03-29 | Read 3rd time & passed | |
2012-03-29 | Senator Benning requested & granted leave to withdraw amendment | |
2012-03-29 | Senator Galbraith requested & granted leave to withdraw his substitute recommendation of amendment | |
2012-03-29 | Senator(s) Galbraith motion to substitute proposal of amendment; text | |
2012-03-29 | Pending third reading, Senator(s) Benning, Baruth, Sears, and Ashe moved to amend bill | |
2012-03-29 | Senator Benning requested & granted leave to withdraw amendment | |
2012-03-29 | Senator Sears requested & granted leave to withdraw his substitute recommendation of amendment | |
2012-03-28 | Pending third reading, motion to amend to be offered by Senator(s) Benning, Baruth, Sears, and Ashe | |
2012-03-28 | Pending Question: Pending Third Reading," Shall the proposal of amendment of Sen. Benning be amended as moved by Sen. Sears?"? | |
2012-03-28 | Called Up | |
2012-03-27 | Called up by Senator Benning & placed on action calendar for March 28, 2012 | |
2012-03-23 | Roll Call, requested by Senator Galbraith, Passed -- Needed 14 of 27 to Pass -- Yeas = 14, Nays = 13 | |
2012-03-23 | Ordered to Lie on a roll call called by Sen. Galbraith | |
2012-03-23 | Senator MacDonald moved to suspend the rules to allow a non-debatable question debatable, which was decided in the negative on a division, 13-14 | |
2012-03-23 | Senator Ashe motion to order bill to lie | |
2012-03-23 | Senator Sears moved to substitute an amendment for that proposed by Senator Benning, Text: | |
2012-03-23 | Pending third reading, Senator(s) Benning and Baruth moved to amend bill | |
2012-03-23 | Pending third reading, bill amended as moved by Senator(s) Lyons, Benning, and McCormack | |
2012-03-23 | Recommendation of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Lyons, Benning, and McCormack | |
2012-03-23 | New Business/Third Reading | |
2012-03-22 | 3rd reading ordered | |
2012-03-22 | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary, as amended, agreed to | |
2012-03-22 | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary amended as recommended by Committee on Appropriations | |
2012-03-22 | Reported favorably by Senator Sears for Committee on Appropriations with recommendation of amendment | |
2012-03-22 | Read second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Sears for Committee on Judiciary | |
2012-03-22 | Unfinished Business/Second Reading | |
2012-03-21 | New Business/Second Reading | |
2012-03-20 | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onAppropriations | |
2012-03-20 | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onJudiciary | |
2012-03-20 | Entered on Notice Calendar | |
2012-03-13 | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31 | |
2012-03-13 | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onJudiciary | |
2012-03-13 | Entered on Notice Calendar | |
2012-01-03 | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary |