VT S0138 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 6 2010 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-12 - Text of Governor's message
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 6 2010 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-12 - Text of Governor's message
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Unfair Business Practices Of Credit Card Companies And Fraudulent Use Of Scanning Devices And Re-encoders
Title
An Act Relating To Unfair Business Practices Of Credit Card Companies And Fraudulent Use Of Scanning Devices And Re-encoders
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-12 | Text of Governor's message | |
2010-05-12 | Allowed to become law without signature of Governor | |
2010-05-12 | Delivered to Governor on May 17, 2010 | |
2010-05-04 | Rules suspended & ordered delivered to Governor forthwith, on motion of Senator Shumlin | |
2010-05-04 | As passed by Senate and House | |
2010-05-04 | House proposal of amendment concurred in | |
2010-05-04 | House proposal of amendment; text | |
2010-05-04 | New Business/House Proposal of Amendment | |
2010-05-03 | House Proposal of Amendment | |
2010-04-30 | House message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment | |
2010-04-29 | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Komline of Dorset | |
2010-04-29 | Read Third time and Passed in Concurrence with Proposal of Amendment | |
2010-04-29 | Rules suspended and bill placed in all remaining stages of passage as moved by Rep. Komline of Dorset | |
2010-04-29 | Third Reading Ordered | |
2010-04-29 | Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 70 of 139 to Pass -- Yeas = 139, Nays = 0 | |
2010-04-29 | Rep. Marcotte of Coventry demanded yeas and nays | |
2010-04-29 | Proposal of Amendment of the Committee on Commerce and Economic Development agreed to | |
2010-04-29 | Amendment as offered by Rep. Savage of Swanton withdrawn | |
2010-04-29 | Rep. Marcotte of Coventry reported for the committee on Commerce and Economic Development | |
2010-04-29 | Read Second Time | |
2010-04-07 | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Commerce and Economic Development | |
2010-04-06 | Rules suspended & action messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Shumlin | |
2010-04-06 | Title to bill amended by Secretary, per Senate Rule 40 | |
2010-04-06 | Read 3rd time & passed | |
2010-04-06 | Unfinished Business/Third Reading | |
2010-04-02 | New Business/Third Reading | |
2010-03-31 | 3rd reading ordered on roll call, requested by Senator Campbell, Passed -- Needed 16 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 30, Nays = 0 | |
2010-03-31 | Recommendation of amendment agreed to | |
2010-03-31 | Senator Campbell, on behalf of Committee on Judiciary, moved to amend bill; text | |
2010-03-31 | Senator Campbell requested & granted leave to withdraw the Judiciary Committee's recommendation of amendment | |
2010-03-31 | Consideration resumed | |
2010-03-31 | Pending question: Shall bill be amended as recommended by Committee on Judiciary? | |
2010-03-31 | Consideration postponed; Second reading | |
2010-03-30 | Pending the question, Shall the bill be amended as recommended by the Committee on Judiciary, on motion of Senator Shumlin further consideration of the bill was postponed to the next legislative day | |
2010-03-30 | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Campbell for Committee on Judiciary | |
2010-03-30 | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary | |
2010-03-30 | New Business/Second Reading | |
2010-03-26 | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onJudiciary | |
2009-04-02 | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary |