VT S0136 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-08 - Signed by Governor on June 8, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-08 - Signed by Governor on June 8, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to miscellaneous consumer protection provisions
Title
An act relating to miscellaneous consumer protection provisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-31 - Senate - Roll Call, requested by Senator Sirotkin, Failed -- Needed 15 of 28 to Pass -- Yeas = 12, Nays = 16 (Y: 12 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-08 | Senate | Signed by Governor on June 8, 2017 |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Signed by Governor on 6/8/17 |
2017-06-02 | Senate | Delivered to Governor on 6/2/17 |
2017-05-12 | Senate | As passed by Senate and House |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Committee of Conference report adopted |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Committee of Conference report submitted by Senator Sirotkin for Committee, text |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2017-05-12 | Senate | House message House adopted Conference Committee report |
2017-05-12 | House | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton |
2017-05-12 | House | Committee of Conference report adopted (Senate bill) |
2017-05-12 | House | Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. Savage of Swanton |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Committee of Conference appointed: Senators Sirotkin, Baruth, and Clarkson |
2017-05-02 | Senate | House proposal of amendment not concurred in; Committee of Conference requested, on motion of Senator Mullin |
2017-05-02 | Senate | House proposal of amendment; text |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2017-05-02 | Senate | House message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment |
2017-05-02 | House | Speaker appointed Marcotte of Coventry, O'Sullivan of Burlington and Hill of Wolcott as members of the Committee of Conference on the part of the House |
2017-05-02 | House | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton |
2017-05-02 | House | Passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2017-05-02 | House | Read Third time |
2017-05-02 | House | Which was agreed to |
2017-05-02 | House | Rep. Donahue of Northfield moved to amend the House proposal of amendment. |
2017-05-02 | House | Which was agreed to |
2017-05-02 | House | Rep. Marcotte of Coventry moved to amend the House proposal of amendment. |
2017-05-01 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2017-05-01 | House | Report of Committee on Commerce and Economic Development as amended agreed to |
2017-05-01 | House | Report of Committee on Ways and Means agreed to. |
2017-05-01 | House | Rep. Browning of Arlington recommended for the committee on Ways and Means |
2017-05-01 | House | Rep. Marcotte of Coventry reported for the committee on Commerce and Economic Development |
2017-05-01 | House | Read Second Time |
2017-04-25 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means per Rule 35(a) |
2017-04-05 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Commerce and Economic Development |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Rules suspended & bill placed on all remaining stages of passage, on motion of Senator Balint |
2017-03-31 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Senator Nitka requested & granted leave to withdraw amendment |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Senator(s) Nitka and Kitchel, text |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Roll Call, requested by Senator Sirotkin, Failed -- Needed 15 of 28 to Pass -- Yeas = 12, Nays = 16 |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment disagreed to |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Senator(s) Rodgers, text |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment disagreed to |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Senator(s) White, text |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment agreed to |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Senator(s) Sirotkin, Balint, Baruth, Clarkson, and Mullin, text |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Consideration resumed |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) White |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Consideration postponed Shall the Bill be read the third time? |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Consideration postponed to next legislative day on motion of Senator Ashe |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment agreed to |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Senator(s) Mullin, Balint, Baruth, Clarkson, and Sirotkin, text |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance agreed to |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Sirotkin for Committee on Finance with recommendation of amendment |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Mullin, Balint, Baruth, Clarkson, and Sirotkin |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Committee Bill for Second Reading |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Appropriations |
2017-03-29 | Senate | New Business/Committee Bill for Second Reading |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Committee Bill for Second Reading |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Committed to the Committee on Finance on motion of Senator Ashe |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Committee bill read first time & placed on Notice Calendar per Senate Rule 48 |