VT S0134 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Senate Message, Signed by Governor June 10, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Senate Message, Signed by Governor June 10, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to background investigations for State employees with access to federal tax information
Title
An act relating to background investigations for State employees with access to federal tax information
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-29 | House | Senate Message, Signed by Governor June 10, 2019 |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Signed by Governor on June 10, 2019 |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Delivered to Governor on June 5, 2019 |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Rules suspended & ordered delivered to Governor forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2019-05-23 | Senate | As passed by Senate and House |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Committee of Conference report adopted |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Committee of Conference report submitted by Senator Pollina for Committee, text |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2019-05-23 | House | Senate message, report of committee of conference adopted |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Committee of Conference Report |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2019-05-22 | Senate | House message House adopted Conference Committee report |
2019-05-22 | House | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney |
2019-05-22 | House | Committee of Conference report adopted (Senate bill) |
2019-05-22 | House | Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney |
2019-05-14 | Senate | House message House appointed Conference Committee members |
2019-05-14 | House | Speaker appointed Gardner of Richmond, Gannon of Wilmington and LaClair of Barre Town as members of the Committee of Conference on the part of the House |
2019-05-14 | House | Senate Message, House proposal of amendment not concurred in and committee of conference appointed |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Committee of Conference appointed: Senators Pollina, Collamore, and White |
2019-05-14 | Senate | House proposal of amendment not concurred in; Committee of Conference requested, on motion of Senator White |
2019-05-14 | Senate | House proposal of amendment; text |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2019-05-14 | Senate | House Proposal of Amendment |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2019-05-13 | Senate | House message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment |
2019-05-13 | House | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney |
2019-05-13 | House | Read Third time and Passed in Concurrence with Proposal of Amendment |
2019-05-13 | House | Rules suspended and bill placed in all remaining stages of passage as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney |
2019-05-13 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2019-05-13 | House | Report of Committee on Government Operations agreed to. |
2019-05-13 | House | Rep. Gardner of Richmond reported for the committee on Government Operations |
2019-05-13 | House | Read Second Time |
2019-03-27 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Government Operations |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed |
2019-03-22 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2019-03-21 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations agreed to |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Read second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Collamore for Committee on Government Operations |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2019-03-20 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Government Operations |