VT S0132 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Recommitted to Committee on Judiciary on motion of Senator Nitka
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to hate crimes and bias incidents

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to hate crimes and bias incidents

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-21SenateRecommitted to Committee on Judiciary on motion of Senator Nitka
2019-03-21SenateUnfinished Business/Third Reading
2019-03-20SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2019-03-19Senate3rd reading ordered
2019-03-19SenateRecommendation of amendment agreed to
2019-03-19SenateRead second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Benning for Committee on Judiciary
2019-03-19SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary
2019-03-19SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2019-03-15SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary
2019-03-15SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2019-02-27SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback