VT S0130 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-28 - Committed to Committee on Education on motion of Senator Baruth
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-28 - Committed to Committee on Education on motion of Senator Baruth
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to miscellaneous changes to education laws
Title
An act relating to miscellaneous changes to education laws
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-28 | Senate | Committed to Committee on Education on motion of Senator Baruth |
2017-04-28 | Senate | House proposal of amendment; text |
2017-04-28 | Senate | New Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2017-04-27 | Senate | House Proposal of Amendment |
2017-04-26 | Senate | House message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment |
2017-04-26 | House | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Savage of Swanton |
2017-04-26 | House | Read Third time and Passed in Concurrence with Proposal of Amendment |
2017-04-26 | House | Which was agreed to |
2017-04-26 | House | Rep. Beck of St. Johnsbury moved to amend the House proposal of amendment. |
2017-04-26 | House | Which was agreed to |
2017-04-26 | House | Rep. Cupoli of Rutland City moved to amend the House proposal of amendment. |
2017-04-26 | House | Which was agreed to |
2017-04-26 | House | Rep. Sibilia of Dover moved to amend the House proposal of amendment. |
2017-04-25 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2017-04-25 | House | Report of Committee on Education as amended agreed to |
2017-04-25 | House | Rep. Pugh of South Burlington moved to amend the House proposal of amendment which was agreed to |
2017-04-25 | House | Report of Committee on Appropriations agreed to. |
2017-04-25 | House | Rep. Juskiewicz of Cambridge recommended for the committee on Appropriations |
2017-04-25 | House | Rep. Conlon of Cornwall spoke for the committee on Education |
2017-04-25 | House | Read Second Time |
2017-04-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a) |
2017-04-05 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Education |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed |
2017-03-31 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2017-03-30 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment disagreed to |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Senator(s) White, Ashe, Clarkson, and Pearson, text |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment agreed to |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Senator(s) Balint, Baruth, Benning, Bray, Ingram, and Mullin, text |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Appropriations agreed to |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator McCormack for Committee on Appropriations with recommendation of amendment |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) White, Ayer, Clarkson, and Pearson |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Balint, Baruth, Benning, Bray, Ingram, and Mullin |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Appropriations |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Committee Bill for Second Reading |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Balint, Baruth, Benning, Bray, Ingram, and Mullin |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Appropriations |
2017-03-29 | Senate | New Business/Committee Bill for Second Reading |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Appropriations |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Committee Bill for Second Reading |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31 |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Committee Bill for Second Reading |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Committee bill read first time & placed on Notice Calendar per Senate Rule 48 |