VT S0128 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-26 - Senate Message, Signed by Governor July 1, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to physician assistant licensure

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to physician assistant licensure

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-26HouseSenate Message, Signed by Governor July 1, 2020
2020-07-01SenateSigned by Governor on July 1, 2020
2020-06-26SenateDelivered to Governor on June 26, 2020
2020-06-19HouseSenate Message, House proposal of amendment concurred in
2020-06-18SenateRules suspended & ordered delivered to Governor forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe
2020-06-18SenateAs passed by Senate and House
2020-06-18SenateHouse proposal of amendment concurred in
2020-06-18SenateHouse proposal of amendment; text
2020-06-18SenateUnfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment
2020-06-17SenateNew Business/House Proposal of Amendment
2020-06-16SenateHouse message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment
2020-06-16SenateHouse Proposal of Amendment
2020-06-16SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2020-06-12HouseRules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney
2020-06-12HouseRead Third time and Passed in Concurrence with Proposal of Amendment
2020-06-12HouseRules suspended and bill placed in all remaining stages of passage as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney
2020-06-12HouseThird Reading Ordered
2020-06-12HouseProposal of amendment of the Committee on Health Care agreed to
2020-06-12HouseWhich was agreed to
2020-06-12HouseRep. Cordes of Lincoln moved to amend the report of the committee on Health Care
2020-06-12HouseRep. Cordes of Lincoln reported for the committee on Health Care
2020-06-12HouseRead Second Time
2020-02-18HouseRead First Time and Referred to the Committee on Health Care
2020-02-13SenateRead 3rd time & passed
2020-02-13SenatePending third reading, bill amended as moved by Senator(s) Sirotkin
2020-02-13SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2020-02-12Senate3rd reading ordered
2020-02-12SenateRecommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare, as amended, agreed to
2020-02-12SenateRecommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare amended as moved by Senator Lyons and Sears
2020-02-12SenateRead second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Ingram for Committee on Health and Welfare
2020-02-12SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare
2020-02-12SenateUnfinished Business/Second Reading
2020-02-11SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare
2020-02-11SenateUnfinished Business/Second Reading
2020-02-07SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare
2020-02-07SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2020-02-06SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare
2020-02-06SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2019-02-26SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Health and Welfare

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback