VT S0127 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-12 - Senate Message, signed by Governor May 23, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-12 - Senate Message, signed by Governor May 23, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to clarifying community supervision furlough appeals and the powers of the Corrections Monitoring Commission
Title
An act relating to clarifying community supervision furlough appeals and the powers of the Corrections Monitoring Commission
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-12 | House | Senate Message, signed by Governor May 23, 2022 |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Signed by Governor on May 23, 2022 |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Delivered to Governor on May 17, 2022 |
2022-05-04 | House | Senate Message, House proposal of amendment concurred in |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Balint |
2022-05-04 | Senate | As passed by Senate and House |
2022-05-04 | Senate | House proposal of amendment concurred in |
2022-05-04 | Senate | House proposal of amendment; text |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2022-05-02 | Senate | New Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2022-04-28 | Senate | House message: House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment |
2022-04-29 | Senate | House Proposal of Amendment |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2022-04-27 | House | Read Third time and passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2022-04-27 | House | Action Calendar: Third reading |
2022-04-26 | House | Third Reading ordered |
2022-04-26 | House | Report of Committee on Corrections and Institutions agreed to |
2022-04-26 | House | Rep. Dolan of Essex reported for the Committee on Corrections and Institutions |
2022-04-26 | House | Read Second time |
2022-04-26 | House | Action Calendar: Favorable with amendment |
2022-04-22 | House | Notice Calendar: Favorable with amendment |
2022-03-25 | House | Read First Time and referred to the Committee on Corrections and Institutions |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Third Reading |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Third Reading |
2022-03-18 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2022-03-17 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment agreed to |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Senator(s) Sears, Baruth, Benning, Nitka, and White, text |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary agreed to |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Sears for Committee on Judiciary |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Sears, Baruth, Benning, Nitka, and White |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary |
2022-03-16 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary |