VT S0123 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-07 - Which was agreed to
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-07 - Which was agreed to
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to limiting liability for animal shelter and rescue organizations assisting law enforcement in animal cruelty investigations
Title
An act relating to limiting liability for animal shelter and rescue organizations assisting law enforcement in animal cruelty investigations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-07 | House | Which was agreed to |
2018-05-07 | House | Rep. Lalonde of South Burlington moved to commit the bill to the committee on Commerce and Economic Development |
2018-02-22 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Judiciary |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed |
2018-02-20 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2018-02-16 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary agreed to |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Read second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Sears for Committee on Judiciary |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary |
2018-02-16 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onJudiciary |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary |