VT S0123 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-31 - Signed by Governor on May 31, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-31 - Signed by Governor on May 31, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to standardized procedures for permits and approvals issued by the Department of Environmental Conservation
Title
An act relating to standardized procedures for permits and approvals issued by the Department of Environmental Conservation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-31 | Senate | Signed by Governor on May 31, 2016 |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Delivered to Governor on May 31, 2016 |
2016-05-05 | Senate | As passed by Senate and House |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Baruth |
2016-05-05 | Senate | House proposal of amendment concurred in |
2016-05-05 | Senate | House proposal of amendment; text |
2016-05-05 | House | Senate message, House proposal of amendment concurred in |
2016-05-04 | Senate | House message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment |
2016-05-05 | Senate | New Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2016-05-04 | Senate | House Proposal of Amendment |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2016-05-02 | House | Read Third time and Passed in Concurrence with Proposal of Amendment |
2016-04-29 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2016-04-29 | House | Report of Committee on Natural Resources and Energy agreed to. |
2016-04-29 | House | Rep. Ryerson of Randolph reported for the committee on Natural Resources and Energy |
2016-04-29 | House | Read Second Time |
2016-03-15 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources & Energy |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed |
2016-03-10 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2016-03-09 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Natural Resources & Energy agreed to |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Read second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Snelling for Committee on Natural Resources & Energy |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Natural Resources & Energy |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Consideration postponed without objection |
2016-03-08 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Natural Resources & Energy |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Natural Resources & Energy |