VT S0118 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-20 - Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Government Operations
Pending: House Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to the time frame for the adoption of administrative rules

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to the time frame for the adoption of administrative rules

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-20HouseRead First Time and Referred to the Committee on Government Operations
2019-03-15SenateRead 3rd time & passed
2019-03-15SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2019-03-14SenateReported favorably by Senator Bray for Committee on Government Operations, read 2nd time and 3rd reading ordered
2019-03-14SenateFavorable report by Committee on Government Operations
2019-03-14SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2019-03-13SenateFavorable report by Committee on Government Operations
2019-03-13SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2019-02-21SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Government Operations

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback