VT S0116 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-25 - Signed by Governor on May 25, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-25 - Signed by Governor on May 25, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to rights of offenders in the custody of the Department of Corrections
Title
An act relating to rights of offenders in the custody of the Department of Corrections
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-25 | Senate | Signed by Governor on May 25, 2016 |
2016-05-23 | Senate | Delivered to Governor on May 23, 2016 |
2016-05-06 | Senate | As passed by Senate and House |
2016-05-06 | Senate | House message House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment to House proposal of amendment |
2016-05-06 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Campbell |
2016-05-06 | Senate | Proposal of amendment to House proposal of amendment agreed to |
2016-05-06 | House | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton |
2016-05-06 | House | Senate Proposal of Amendment concurred in |
2016-05-06 | House | Senate proposal of amendment considered |
2016-05-06 | House | Which was agreed to |
2016-05-06 | House | Rep. Turner of Milton moved to suspend rules and take up bill for immediate consideration |
2016-05-06 | House | Senate message, House proposal of amendment concurred in with further amendment thereto |
2016-05-06 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Flory for Committee on Institutions with proposal of amendment to House proposal of amendment |
2016-05-06 | Senate | House proposal of amendment; text |
2016-05-06 | Senate | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Baruth |
2016-05-06 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2016-05-06 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Institutions |
2016-05-06 | Senate | House Proposal of Amendment |
2016-04-26 | Senate | House proposal of amendment; text |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Recommitted to Committee on Institutions on motion of Senator Flory |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2016-04-25 | Senate | Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2016-04-23 | Senate | New Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2016-04-21 | Senate | House message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment |
2016-04-22 | Senate | House Proposal of Amendment |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2016-04-20 | House | Read Third time and Passed in Concurrence with Proposal of Amendment |
2016-04-19 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2016-04-19 | House | Report of Committee on Corrections & Institutions agreed to. |
2016-04-19 | House | Rep. Myers of Essex reported for the committee on Corrections & Institutions |
2016-04-19 | House | Read Second Time |
2016-03-16 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Corrections & Institutions |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed |
2016-03-11 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2016-03-10 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Institutions, as amended, agreed to |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Institutions amended as recommended by Committee on Judiciary |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Benning for Committee on Judiciary with recommendation of amendment |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Read second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Flory for Committee on Institutions |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Institutions |
2016-03-10 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onJudiciary |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onInstitutions |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Rules suspended & bill committed to Committee on Judiciary with the report of Committee on Institutions intact, on motion of Senator Flory |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onInstitutions |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Institutions |