VT S0113 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-05 - Signed by Governor on May 16, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-05 - Signed by Governor on May 16, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Prevention, Identification, And Reporting Of Child Abuse And Neglect At Independent Schools
Title
An Act Relating To Prevention, Identification, And Reporting Of Child Abuse And Neglect At Independent Schools
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-05 | Signed by Governor on May 16, 2012 | |
2012-05-05 | Delivered to Governor on May 10, 2012 | |
2012-05-05 | Rules suspended & ordered delivered to Governor forthwith, on motion of Senator Mazza | |
2012-05-05 | As passed by Senate and House | |
2012-05-05 | Committee of Conference report adopted | |
2012-05-05 | Committee of Conference addendum report submitted by Senator Mullin for Committee, text | |
2012-05-05 | Committee of Conference report submitted by Senator Mullin for Committee, text | |
2012-05-05 | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Campbell | |
2012-05-05 | House message House adopted Conference Committee report | |
2012-05-05 | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton | |
2012-05-05 | Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 65 of 129 to Pass -- Yeas = 127, Nays = 2 | |
2012-05-05 | Addendum to Committee of Conference report agreed to | |
2012-05-05 | Committee of Conference report agreed to (Senate bill) | |
2012-05-05 | Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 97 of 129 to Pass -- Yeas = 127, Nays = 2 | |
2012-05-05 | Rules suspended | |
2012-05-05 | Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. Savage of Swanton | |
2012-05-01 | House message House appointed Conference Committee members | |
2012-05-01 | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton | |
2012-05-01 | Speaker appointed Donovan of Burlington, Gilbert of Fairfax and Buxton of Tunbridge as members of the Committee of Conference on the part of the House | |
2012-05-01 | Senate Message, House proposal of amendment not concurred in and committee of conference appointed | |
2012-05-01 | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Campbell | |
2012-04-30 | Committee of Conference appointed: Senators Mullin, Baruth, and Kittell | |
2012-04-30 | House proposal of amendment not concurred in; Committee of Conference requested, on motion of Senator Mullin | |
2012-04-30 | House proposal of amendment; text | |
2012-04-30 | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Campbell | |
2012-04-30 | House Proposal of Amendment | |
2012-04-30 | Entered on Notice Calendar | |
2012-04-28 | House message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment | |
2012-04-28 | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Savage of Swanton | |
2012-04-28 | Read Third time and Passed in Concurrence with Proposal of Amendment | |
2012-04-28 | Amendment as offered by Rep. Fisher of Lincoln agreed to | |
2012-04-27 | Third Reading Ordered | |
2012-04-27 | Proposal of Amendment of the Committee on Education agreed to | |
2012-04-26 | Rep. Rep. Manwaring of Wilmington, recommended for the committee on Appropriations | |
2012-04-26 | Rep. Rep. Donovan of Burlington reported for the committee on Education | |
2012-04-27 | Read Second Time | |
2012-04-24 | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a) | |
2012-02-15 | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Education | |
2012-02-14 | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Campbell | |
2012-02-14 | Read 3rd time & passed | |
2012-02-14 | New Business/Third Reading | |
2012-02-09 | Reported favorably by Senator Mullin for Committee on Education, read 2nd time and 3rd reading ordered | |
2012-02-08 | Favorable report by Committee on Education | |
2012-02-08 | Entered on Notice Calendar | |
2012-01-03 | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Education |