VT S0109 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Signed by Governor on April 18, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Signed by Governor on April 18, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to captive insurance companies and risk retention groups
Title
An act relating to captive insurance companies and risk retention groups
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-18 | Senate | Signed by Governor on April 18, 2019 |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Delivered to Governor on April 15, 2019 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | As passed by Senate and House |
2019-03-28 | Senate | House message House passed bill in concurrence |
2019-03-26 | House | Read Third time and Passed in Concurrence |
2019-03-22 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2019-03-22 | House | Rep. Kornheiser of Brattleboro reported for the committee on Commerce and Economic Development |
2019-03-22 | House | Read Second Time |
2019-03-13 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Commerce and Economic Development |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed |
2019-03-01 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2019-02-28 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Balint for Committee on Finance |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Finance |
2019-02-28 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Finance |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Finance |