VT S0107 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Senate Message, Signed by Governor June 17, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Senate Message, Signed by Governor June 17, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to elections corrections
Title
An act relating to elections corrections
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-29 | House | Senate Message, Signed by Governor June 17, 2019 |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Signed by Governor on June 17, 2019 |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Delivered to Governor on June 11, 2019 |
2019-05-20 | Senate | As passed by Senate and House |
2019-05-20 | Senate | House message House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment to House proposal of amendment |
2019-05-17 | House | Senate Proposal of Amendment to the House Proposal of Amendment agreed to |
2019-05-17 | House | Senate Proposal of Amendment considered |
2019-05-15 | House | Senate message, House proposal of amendment concurred in with further amendment thereto |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2019-05-15 | Senate | House proposal of amendment concurred in with proposal of amendment, on motion of Senator White, Bray, Clarkson, and Pollina |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Senator White, Bray, Clarkson, and Pollina moved to concur in House proposal of amendment with proposal of amendment; text |
2019-05-15 | Senate | House proposal of amendment; text |
2019-05-15 | Senate | New Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2019-05-14 | Senate | House Proposal of Amendment |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2019-05-13 | Senate | House message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment |
2019-05-10 | House | Read Third time and Passed in Concurrence with Proposal of Amendment |
2019-05-10 | House | Amendment as offered by Rep. Donahue of Northfield agreed to |
2019-05-10 | House | Amendment as offered by Rep. Mrowicki of Putney, Brownell of Pownal, and Colston of Winooski agreed to |
2019-05-10 | House | Rules suspended and bill placed in all remaining stages of passage as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney |
2019-05-10 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2019-05-10 | House | Report of Committee on Government Operations agreed to. |
2019-05-10 | House | Rep. Mrowicki of Putney reported for the committee on Government Operations |
2019-05-10 | House | Read Second Time |
2019-03-26 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Government Operations |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Motion agreed to |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Pending third reading, motion to amend bill offered by Senator(s) Collamore, Bray, Clarkson, Pollina, and White |
2019-03-21 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2019-03-20 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations, as amended, agreed to |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations amended as moved by Senator Collamore, Bray, Clarkson, Pollina, and White |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Read second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Collamore for Committee on Government Operations |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Collamore, Bray, Clarkson, Pollina, and White |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2019-03-19 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Government Operations |