VT S0106 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-05 - Signed by Governor on May 16, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-05 - Signed by Governor on May 16, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Miscellaneous Changes To Municipal Government Law, To Internal Financial Controls, To The Management Of Search And Rescue Operations, And To Emergency Medical Services
Title
An Act Relating To Miscellaneous Changes To Municipal Government Law, To Internal Financial Controls, To The Management Of Search And Rescue Operations, And To Emergency Medical Services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-05 | Signed by Governor on May 16, 2012 | |
2012-05-05 | Delivered to Governor on May 10, 2012 | |
2012-05-05 | As passed by Senate and House | |
2012-05-05 | Rules suspended & ordered delivered to Governor forthwith, on motion of Senator Campbell | |
2012-05-05 | House proposal of amendment concurred in on roll call requested by Senator Lyons, Passed -- Needed 14 of 27 to Pass -- Yeas = 27, Nays = 0 | |
2012-05-05 | House proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment, text | |
2012-05-05 | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Campbell | |
2012-05-05 | House message House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment to House proposal of amendment, with further proposal of amendment | |
2012-05-05 | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton | |
2012-05-05 | Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 67 of 133 to Pass -- Yeas = 133, Nays = 0 | |
2012-05-05 | Senate Proposal of Amendment concurred in with further amendment thereto, as offered by Rep. Jewett of Ripton | |
2012-05-02 | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Campbell | |
2012-05-02 | House proposal of amendment concurred in with proposal of amendment | |
2012-05-02 | Senator Flory moved to concur in House proposal of amendment with proposal of amendment; text | |
2012-05-02 | House proposal of amendment; text | |
2012-04-30 | House Proposal of Amendment | |
2012-04-28 | Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment | |
2012-04-27 | Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment | |
2012-04-26 | Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment | |
2012-04-25 | Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment | |
2012-04-24 | Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment | |
2012-04-23 | New Business/House Proposal of Amendment | |
2012-04-21 | House Proposal of Amendment | |
2012-04-20 | House message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment | |
2012-04-18 | Read Third time and Passed in Concurrence with Proposal of Amendment | |
2012-04-18 | Amendment as offered by Rep. Lippert of Hinesburg agreed to | |
2012-04-17 | Third Reading Ordered | |
2012-04-17 | Proposal of Amendment of the Committee on Government Operations agreed to | |
2012-04-17 | Rep. Rep. Higley of Lowell reported for the committee on Government Operations | |
2012-04-17 | Read Second Time | |
2012-03-22 | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Government Operations | |
2012-03-20 | Read 3rd time & passed | |
2012-03-20 | Pending third reading, bill amended as moved by Senator(s) Flory | |
2012-03-20 | Consideration resumed | |
2012-03-20 | Consideration postponed on motion of Senator Campbell | |
2012-03-20 | Pending third reading, bill amended as moved by Senator(s) Sears | |
2012-03-20 | Pending third reading, bill amended as moved by Senator(s) Flory | |
2012-03-20 | Recommendation of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Sears | |
2012-03-20 | Recommendation of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Flory | |
2012-03-20 | Unfinished Business/Third Reading | |
2012-03-16 | New Business/Third Reading | |
2012-03-15 | 3rd reading ordered | |
2012-03-15 | Reported favorably by Senator Ashe for Committee on Finance | |
2012-03-15 | Read second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Flory for Committee on Government Operations | |
2012-03-15 | New Business/Second Reading | |
2012-03-14 | Favorable report by Committee on Finance | |
2012-03-14 | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations | |
2012-03-14 | Entered on Notice Calendar | |
2012-02-07 | Committed to Committee on Finance with report of Committee on Government Operations intact, under suspension of Senate Rule 49, on motion of Senator Cummings | |
2012-02-07 | New Business/Second Reading | |
2012-02-02 | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onGovernment Operations | |
2012-02-02 | Entered on Notice Calendar | |
2011-04-08 | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Government Operations |