VT S0104 | 2023-2024 | Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-7)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-03-23 - Read First Time and referred to the Committee on General and Housing
Pending: House General and Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-03-23 - Read First Time and referred to the Committee on General and Housing
Pending: House General and Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to designating August 31 as Overdose Awareness Day
Title
An act relating to designating August 31 as Overdose Awareness Day
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-23 | House | Read First Time and referred to the Committee on General and Housing |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed |
2023-03-21 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2023-03-17 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2023-03-17 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations agreed to |
2023-03-17 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Norris for Committee on Government Operations |
2023-03-17 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2023-03-17 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Government Operations |