VT S0103 | 2023-2024 | Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-20 - Senate Message, signed by Governor June 28, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to amending the prohibitions against discrimination

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to amending the prohibitions against discrimination

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-05-10 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 73 of 146 to Pass -- Yeas = 125, Nays = 21 (Y: 125 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-20HouseSenate Message, signed by Governor June 28, 2023
2023-06-20SenateSigned by Governor on June 28, 2023
2023-06-20SenateDelivered to Governor on June 22, 2023
2023-06-20HouseSenate Message, House proposal of amendment concurred in
2023-06-20SenateRules suspended & ordered delivered to Governor forthwith, on motion of Senator Baruth
2023-06-20SenateAs passed by Senate and House
2023-06-20SenateHouse proposal of amendment concurred in
2023-06-20SenateHouse proposal of amendment; text
2023-06-20SenateRules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Baruth
2023-06-20SenateHouse proposal of amendment
2023-05-12SenateHouse message: House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment
2023-05-11HouseRead third time and passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment
2023-05-11HouseRep. Bartley of Fairfax asked and was granted leave to withdraw amendment
2023-05-11HouseRep. Bartley of Fairfax, Hango of Berkshire, Labor of Morgan, and Parsons of Newbury moved to amend the House proposal of amend
2023-05-11HouseAction Calendar: Third reading
2023-05-10HouseThird Reading ordered
2023-05-10HouseReport of Committee on General and Housing agreed to
2023-05-10HouseSecond division of amendment agreed to
2023-05-10HouseRoll Call Results Passed -- Needed 73 of 146 to Pass -- Yeas = 125, Nays = 21
2023-05-10HouseRep. Mulvaney-Stanak of Burlington demanded yeas and nays
2023-05-10HouseFirst division of amendment agreed to
2023-05-10HouseRep. Donahue of Northfield asked that the question be divided
2023-05-10HouseRep. Burrows of West Windsor reported for the Committee on General and Housing
2023-05-10HouseRead second time
2023-05-10HouseAction Calendar: Favorable with Amendment
2023-05-09HouseNotice Calendar: Favorable with amendment
2023-05-05HouseRep. Conlon of Cornwall moved that the Committee on Education be relieved of the bill and that the same be recommitted to the Committee on General and Housing, which was agreed to
2023-05-02HouseRep. Stevens of Waterbury moved to commit bill to the Committee on Education, which was agreed to
2023-05-02HouseAction Calendar: Favorable with Amendment
2023-05-01HouseAction Calendar: Favorable with Amendment
2023-04-28HouseNotice Calendar: Favorable with amendment
2023-03-28HouseRead first time and referred to the Committee on General and Housing
2023-03-23SenateRead 3rd time & passed
2023-03-23SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2023-03-22Senate3rd reading ordered
2023-03-22SenateRecommendation of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs agreed to
2023-03-22SenateRead 2nd time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Harrison for Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs
2023-03-22SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs
2023-03-22SenateSecond Reading
2023-03-21SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs
2023-03-21SenateSecond Reading
2023-03-21SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2023-02-24SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback