VT S0103 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-05-11 - Committed to the Committee on Health and Welfare on motion of Senator Ashe
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to the regulation of toxic substances and hazardous materials

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to the regulation of toxic substances and hazardous materials

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-11SenateCommitted to the Committee on Health and Welfare on motion of Senator Ashe
2017-05-11SenateHouse proposal of amendment; text
2017-05-11SenateNew Business/House Proposal of Amendment
2017-05-10SenateHouse Proposal of Amendment
2017-05-08SenateHouse message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment
2017-05-05HousePassed in Concurrence with Proposal of Amendment
2017-05-05HouseRead Third time
2017-05-05HouseWhich was disagreed to
2017-05-05HouseRoll Call Results Failed -- Needed 70 of 138 to Pass -- Yeas = 62, Nays = 76
2017-05-05HouseRep. Poirier of Barre City moved to amend the House proposal of amendment.
2017-05-04HouseThird Reading Ordered
2017-05-04HouseRoll Call Results Passed -- Needed 73 of 145 to Pass -- Yeas = 93, Nays = 52
2017-05-04HouseReport of the Committee on Natural Resources, Fish & Wildlife amended as recommended by the Committee on Appropriations
2017-05-04HouseRep. Feltus of Lyndon recommended for the committee on Appropriations
2017-05-04HouseRep. Masland of Thetford recommended for the committee on Ways and Means
2017-05-04HouseRep. Deen of Westminster reported for the committee on Natural Resources, Fish & Wildlife
2017-05-04HouseRead Second Time
2017-05-02HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a)
2017-05-01HouseReferred to Committee on Ways and Means per Rule 35(a)
2017-04-05HouseRead First Time and Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, Fish & Wildlife
2017-03-31SenateRead 3rd time & passed on roll call, requested by Senator Bray, Passed -- Needed 14 of 27 to Pass -- Yeas = 27, Nays = 0
2017-03-31SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2017-03-30Senate3rd reading ordered
2017-03-30SenateMotion disagreed to
2017-03-30SenateSenator Branagan motion to commit bill to Committee on Health and Welfare
2017-03-30SenateRecommendation of amendment by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy agreed to
2017-03-30SenateReported favorably by Senator Nitka for Committee on Appropriations
2017-03-30SenateReported favorably by Senator Sirotkin for Committee on Finance
2017-03-30SenateRead second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Campion for Committee on Natural Resources and Energy
2017-03-30SenateFavorable report by Committee on Appropriations
2017-03-30SenateFavorable report by Committee on Finance
2017-03-30SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy
2017-03-30SenateUnfinished Business/Second Reading
2017-03-29SenateFavorable report by Committee on Appropriations
2017-03-29SenateFavorable report by Committee on Finance
2017-03-29SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy
2017-03-29SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2017-03-28SenateFavorable report by Committee on Appropriations
2017-03-28SenateFavorable report by Committee on Finance
2017-03-28SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onNatural Resources and Energy
2017-03-22SenateReferred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31
2017-03-22SenateFavorable report by Committee on Finance
2017-03-22SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onNatural Resources and Energy
2017-03-21SenateReferred to Committee on Finance per Senate Rule 31
2017-03-21SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onNatural Resources and Energy
2017-02-28SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Natural Resources and Energy

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback