VT S0103 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-12 - Signed by Governor on May 27, 2010
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-12 - Signed by Governor on May 27, 2010
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To The Study And Recommendation Of Ignition Interlock Device Legislation
Title
An Act Relating To The Study And Recommendation Of Ignition Interlock Device Legislation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-12 | Signed by Governor on May 27, 2010 | |
2010-05-12 | Delivered to Governor on May 21, 2010 | |
2010-05-08 | As passed by Senate and House | |
2010-05-08 | Committee of Conference report adopted | |
2010-05-08 | Committee of Conference report submitted by Senator Kitchel for Committee, text | |
2010-05-08 | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Shumlin | |
2010-05-08 | Committee of Conference Report | |
2010-05-07 | House message House adopted Conference Committee report | |
2010-05-07 | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Komline of Dorset | |
2010-05-07 | Committee of Conference report agreed to (Senate bill) | |
2010-05-04 | Speaker appointed Grad of Moretown, French of Shrewsbury and Marek of Newfane as members of the Committee of Conference on the part of the House | |
2010-05-04 | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Shumlin | |
2010-05-04 | Committee of Conference appointed: Senators Kitchel, Scott, and Sears | |
2010-05-04 | House proposal of amendment not concurred in; Committee of Conference requested, on motion of Senator Mazza | |
2010-05-04 | House proposal of amendment; text | |
2010-05-04 | New Business/House Proposal of Amendment | |
2010-05-03 | House Proposal of Amendment | |
2010-05-03 | House message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment | |
2010-04-30 | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Komline of Dorset | |
2010-04-30 | Read Third time and Passed in Concurrence with Proposal of Amendment | |
2010-04-29 | Third Reading Ordered | |
2010-04-29 | Proposal of Amendment of the Committee on Judiciary agreed to | |
2010-04-29 | Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 71 of 141 to Pass -- Yeas = 141, Nays = 0 | |
2010-04-29 | Rep. French of Shrewsbury demanded yeas and nays | |
2010-04-29 | Rep. French of Shrewsbury reported for the committee on Judiciary | |
2010-04-29 | Read Second Time | |
2010-03-23 | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Judiciary | |
2010-03-19 | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Shumlin | |
2010-03-19 | As passed by Senate | |
2010-03-19 | Read 3rd time & passed | |
2010-03-19 | New Business/Third Reading | |
2010-03-18 | 3rd reading ordered | |
2010-03-18 | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Transportation agreed to | |
2010-03-18 | Read second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Kitchel for Committee on Transportation | |
2010-03-18 | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Transportation | |
2010-03-18 | Unfinished Business/Second Reading | |
2010-03-17 | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Transportation | |
2010-03-17 | New Business/Second Reading | |
2010-03-16 | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onTransportation | |
2009-02-24 | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Transportation |