VT S0101 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-30 - Signed by Governor on May 30, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-30 - Signed by Governor on May 30, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to the conduct of forestry operations
Title
An act relating to the conduct of forestry operations
Sponsors
Sen. John Rodgers [D] | Rep. Carolyn Branagan [R] | Sen. Brian Collamore [R] | Sen. Dustin Degree [R] |
Sen. Robert Starr [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-12 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 66 of 131 to Pass -- Yeas = 127, Nays = 4 (Y: 127 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - Senate - Read 3rd time & passed on roll call, requested by Senator MacDonald, Passed -- Needed 16 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 30, Nays = 0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - 3rd reading ordered on roll call, requested by Senator Westman, Passed -- Needed 15 of 28 to Pass -- Yeas = 27, Nays = 1 (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - Senate - Read 3rd time & passed on roll call, requested by Senator MacDonald, Passed -- Needed 16 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 30, Nays = 0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - 3rd reading ordered on roll call, requested by Senator Westman, Passed -- Needed 15 of 28 to Pass -- Yeas = 27, Nays = 1 (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-30 | Senate | Signed by Governor on May 30, 2018 |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Delivered to Governor on May 24, 2018 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | As passed by Senate and House |
2018-05-03 | Senate | House message House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment to House proposal of amendment |
2018-05-01 | House | Senate Proposal of Amendment concurred in |
2018-04-26 | House | Senate message, House proposal of amendment concurred in with further amendment thereto |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Proposal of amendment to House proposal of amendment agreed to |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Senator Branagan moved to concur in House proposal of amendment with proposal of amendment; text |
2018-04-25 | Senate | House proposal of amendment; text |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2018-04-19 | Senate | New Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2018-04-18 | Senate | House message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment |
2018-04-18 | Senate | House Proposal of Amendment |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2018-04-13 | House | Passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2018-04-13 | House | Read Third time |
2018-04-12 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2018-04-12 | House | Report of Committee on Agriculture and Forestry agreed to. |
2018-04-12 | House | Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 66 of 131 to Pass -- Yeas = 127, Nays = 4 |
2018-04-12 | House | Rep. Higley of Lowell reported for the committee on Agriculture and Forestry |
2018-04-12 | House | Read Second Time |
2018-01-26 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Agriculture and Forestry |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed on roll call, requested by Senator MacDonald, Passed -- Needed 16 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 30, Nays = 0 |
2018-01-24 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2018-01-23 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered on roll call, requested by Senator Westman, Passed -- Needed 15 of 28 to Pass -- Yeas = 27, Nays = 1 |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Agriculture, as amended, agreed to |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Agriculture amended as moved by Senator Branagan, Sirotkin, and Starr |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Branagan, Sirotkin, and Starr |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Pending question: Shall bill be amended as recommended by Committee on Agriculture? |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Bray and Starr |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Pending question: Shall bill be amended as recommended by Committee on Agriculture? |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Consideration postponed to January 19, 2018 |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Consideration postponed to next legislative day on motion of Senator Baruth |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Read second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Branagan for Committee on Agriculture |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Senator MacDonald requested & granted leave to withdraw motion |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Senator MacDonald moved to suspend rules to have the President of the Senate commit the bill to the committee of jurisdiction with the report of Agriculture intact |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Agriculture |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Agriculture |
2018-01-17 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onAgriculture |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Committee on Judiciary relieved; bill committed to Committee on Agriculture on motion of Senator Sears |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary |