VT S0100 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Enrolled on April 30 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2022-05-10 - As passed by Senate and House
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to universal school meals

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to universal school meals

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2022-05-10SenateAs passed by Senate and House
2022-05-10SenateHouse message: House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment to House proposal of amendment
2022-05-09HouseSenate proposal of amendment to the House proposal of amendment concurred in
2022-05-09HouseAction Calendar: Senate proposal of amendment
2022-05-07HouseNotice Calendar: Senate proposal of amendment
2022-05-06HouseSenate Message, House proposal of amendment concurred in with further amendment thereto
2022-05-06SenateRules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Mazza
2022-05-06SenateProposal of amendment agreed to
2022-05-06SenateProposal of amendment by Senator(s) Campion, Chittenden, Hooker, Lyons, Perchlik, and Terenzini; text
2022-05-06SenateHouse proposal of amendment; text
2022-05-06SenateProposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Campion, Chittenden, Hooker, Lyons, Perchlik, and Terenzini
2022-05-06SenateUnfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment
2022-05-05SenateUnfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment
2022-05-04SenateUnfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment
2022-05-03SenateUnfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment
2022-05-02SenateNew Business/House Proposal of Amendment
2022-04-28SenateHouse message: House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment
2022-04-29SenateHouse Proposal of Amendment
2022-04-29SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2022-04-27HouseRead Third time and passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment
2022-04-27HouseAction Calendar: Third reading
2022-04-26HouseThird Reading ordered
2022-04-26HouseReport of Committee on Education as amended agreed to
2022-04-26HouseReport of the Committee on Education amended as recommended by the Committee on Ways and Means
2022-04-26HouseDivision results Yays 93, Nays 33
2022-04-26HouseDivision demanded
2022-04-26HouseRep. Scheu of Middlebury recommended for the Committee on Appropriations
2022-04-26HouseRep. Durfee of Shaftsbury recommended for the Committee on Ways and Means
2022-04-26HouseRep. Brady of Williston reported for the Committee on Education
2022-04-26HouseRead Second time
2022-04-26HouseAction Calendar: Favorable with amendment
2022-04-22HouseNotice Calendar: Favorable with amendment
2022-04-19HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a)
2022-04-19HouseNotice Calendar: Favorable with amendment
2022-04-07HouseReferred to Committee on Ways and Means per Rule 35(a)
2021-05-04HouseRead First Time and referred to the Committee on Education
2021-04-30SenateRules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Balint
2021-04-30SenateRead 3rd time & passed on roll call, requested by Senator Pearson, Passed -- Needed 15 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 29, Nays = 1
2021-04-30SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2021-04-29Senate3rd reading ordered
2021-04-29SenateRecommendation of amendment by Committee on Appropriations, as amended, agreed to
2021-04-29SenateProposal of amendment agreed to
2021-04-29SenateProposal of amendment by Senator(s) Campion, Chittenden, Collamore, Hooker, Lyons, Parent, Pearson, Perchlik, Pollina, and Starr; text
2021-04-29SenateReported favorably by Senator Baruth for Committee on Appropriations with recommendation of amendment
2021-04-29SenateReported favorably by Senator Campion for Committee on Education
2021-04-29SenateRead 2nd time
2021-04-29SenateRecommendation of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Campion, Chittenden, Hooker, Lyons, Parent, Pearson, Perchlik, Pollina, and Starr
2021-04-29SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Appropriations
2021-04-29SenateFavorable report by Committee on Education
2021-04-29SenateCommittee Bill for Second Reading
2021-04-29SenateCalled Up
2021-04-28SenateCalled up by Senator Balint & placed on action calendar for April 29, 2021
2021-04-02SenateOrdered to lie on motion of Senator Starr
2021-04-02SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Appropriations
2021-04-02SenateFavorable report by Committee on Education
2021-04-02SenateUnfinished Business/Committee Bill for Second Reading
2021-04-01SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Appropriations
2021-04-01SenateFavorable report by Committee on Education
2021-04-01SenateUnfinished Business/Committee Bill for Second Reading
2021-03-31SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Appropriations
2021-03-31SenateFavorable report by Committee on Education
2021-03-31SenateUnfinished Business/Committee Bill for Second Reading
2021-03-30SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Appropriations
2021-03-30SenateFavorable report by Committee on Education
2021-03-30SenateCommittee Bill for Second Reading
2021-03-30SenateConsideration Postponed/Second Reading
2021-03-26SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Appropriations
2021-03-26SenateFavorable report by Committee on Education
2021-03-26SenateCommittee Bill for Second Reading
2021-03-26SenateConsideration postponed to April 1, 2021
2021-03-25SenateConsideration postponed April 1, 2021 on motion of Senator Balint
2021-03-25SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Appropriations
2021-03-25SenateFavorable report by Committee on Education
2021-03-25SenateUnfinished Business/Committee Bill for Second Reading
2021-03-24SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Appropriations
2021-03-24SenateFavorable report by Committee on Education
2021-03-24SenateNew Business/Committee Bill for Second Reading
2021-03-23SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Appropriations
2021-03-23SenateFavorable report by Committee on Education
2021-03-23SenateCommittee Bill for Second Reading
2021-03-23SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2021-03-16SenateReferred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31
2021-03-16SenateFavorable report by Committee on Education
2021-03-16SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2021-02-26SenateOn motion of Senator Starr, rules suspended bill was committed to the Committee on Education
2021-02-26SenateCommittee bill read first time & placed on Notice Calendar per Senate Rule 48

Vermont State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://legislature.vermont.gov/bill/status/2022/S.100
Texthttps://legislature.vermont.gov/Documents/2022/Docs/BILLS/S-0100/S-0100%20As%20Introduced.pdf
Texthttps://legislature.vermont.gov/Documents/2022/Docs/BILLS/S-0100/S-0100%20As%20passed%20by%20the%20Senate%20Official.pdf
Texthttps://legislature.vermont.gov/Documents/2022/Docs/BILLS/S-0100/S-0100%20As%20Passed%20by%20Both%20House%20and%20Senate%20Official.pdf
Supplementhttps://ljfo.vermont.gov/assets/Publications/Senate-Bills/71933a7238/GENERAL-353887-v8-FiscalNotes_S.100_031021-002.pdf
Supplementhttps://ljfo.vermont.gov/assets/Publications/Senate-Bills/97d2055930/S_100_Universal_Breakfast_051021.pdf
Supplementhttps://ljfo.vermont.gov/assets/Publications/Senate-Bills/b1bf768150/GENERAL-361961-v1-S_100_Fiscal_Note_v2.pdf
Supplementhttps://ljfo.vermont.gov/assets/Publications/Senate-Bills/5bbf80712d/GENERAL-362327-v1-S_100_fiscal_note_ammended_by_Ways_and_Means.pdf
Supplementhttps://ljfo.vermont.gov/assets/Publications/Senate-Bills/8596737501/GENERAL-362327-v1-S_100_fiscal_note_passed-by-GA.pdf
Roll Callhttps://legislature.vermont.gov/bill/roll-call/2022/53

Bill Comments

feedback