VT S0100 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-06 - Signed by Governor on May 31, 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-06 - Signed by Governor on May 31, 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Making Miscellaneous Amendments To Education Laws
Title
An Act Relating To Making Miscellaneous Amendments To Education Laws
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-06 | Signed by Governor on May 31, 2011 | |
2011-05-06 | Delivered to Governor on May 25, 2011 | |
2011-05-05 | As passed by Senate and House | |
2011-05-05 | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Campbell | |
2011-05-05 | Committee of Conference report adopted | |
2011-05-05 | Committee of Conference report submitted by Senator Mullin for Committee, text | |
2011-05-05 | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Campbell | |
2011-05-05 | House message House adopted Conference Committee report | |
2011-05-05 | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton | |
2011-05-05 | Committee of Conference report agreed to (Senate bill) | |
2011-05-05 | Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton | |
2011-05-03 | Speaker appointed Crawford of Burke, Donovan of Burlington and Gilbert of Fairfax as members of the Committee of Conference on the part of the House | |
2011-05-03 | Committee of Conference appointed | |
2011-05-02 | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Campbell | |
2011-05-02 | Committee of Conference appointed: Senators Mullin, Baruth, and Kittell | |
2011-05-02 | House proposal of amendment not concurred in; Committee of Conference requested, on motion of Senator Mullin | |
2011-05-02 | House proposal of amendment; text | |
2011-05-02 | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Campbell | |
2011-05-02 | House message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment | |
2011-05-02 | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton | |
2011-05-02 | Read Third time and Passed in Concurrence with Proposal of Amendment | |
2011-05-02 | Rep. Crawford of Burke moved that the House propose to the Senate to amend the bill which was agreed to | |
2011-05-02 | Rep. Gilbert of Fairfax moved that the House propose to the Senate to amend the bill which was agreed to | |
2011-04-29 | Third Reading Ordered | |
2011-04-29 | Proposal of Amendment of the Committee on Education agreed to | |
2011-04-29 | Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 68 of 134 to Pass -- Yeas = 57, Nays = 77 | |
2011-04-29 | Rep. Savage of Swanton moved to amend the report of the committee on Education, which was disagreed to | |
2011-04-29 | Rep. Donahue of Northfield moved to amend the report of the committee on Education, which was disagreed to | |
2011-04-29 | Rep. Crawford of Burke reported for the committee on Education | |
2011-04-29 | Read Second Time | |
2011-04-29 | Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton | |
2011-04-07 | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Education | |
2011-04-06 | Read 3rd time & passed | |
2011-04-06 | New Business/Third Reading | |
2011-04-05 | 3rd reading ordered | |
2011-04-05 | Reported favorably by Senator Starr for Committee on Appropriations | |
2011-04-05 | Reported favorably by Senator Westman for Committee on Finance | |
2011-04-05 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-04-01 | Unfinished Business/Committee Bill for Second Reading | |
2011-04-01 | Unfinished Business/Committee Bill for Second Reading | |
2011-03-31 | New Business/Committee Bill for Second Reading | |
2011-03-30 | Favorable report by Committee on Appropriations | |
2011-03-30 | Entered on Notice Calendar | |
2011-03-25 | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31 | |
2011-03-25 | Favorable report by Committee on Finance | |
2011-03-25 | Committee Bill for Second Reading | |
2011-03-22 | Referred to Committee on Finance per Senate Rule 31 | |
2011-03-22 | Committee Bill for Second Reading | |
2011-03-18 | Committee bill read first time & placed on Notice Calendar per Senate Rule 48 |