VT S0097 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 1 2009 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-12 - Text of Governor's message
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on May 1 2009 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-12 - Text of Governor's message
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To A Vermont State Employees' Cost-savings Incentive Program
Title
An Act Relating To A Vermont State Employees' Cost-savings Incentive Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-12 | Text of Governor's message | |
2010-05-12 | Allowed to become law without signature of Governor | |
2010-05-12 | Delivered to Governor on May 27, 2010 | |
2010-05-08 | Rules suspended & ordered delivered to Governor forthwith, on motion of Senator Shumlin | |
2010-05-08 | As passed by Senate and House | |
2010-05-08 | Committee of Conference report adopted | |
2010-05-08 | Committee of Conference report submitted by Senator Doyle for Committee, text | |
2010-05-08 | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Shumlin | |
2010-05-08 | Committee of Conference Report | |
2010-05-07 | House message House adopted Conference Committee report | |
2010-05-07 | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Komline of Dorset | |
2010-05-07 | Committee of Conference report agreed to (Senate bill) | |
2010-05-07 | Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. Komline of Dorset | |
2010-05-03 | Speaker appointed Evans of Essex, Martin of Wolcott and McDonald of Berlin as members of the Committee of Conference on the part of the House | |
2010-05-03 | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Shumlin | |
2010-05-03 | Committee of Conference appointed: Senators Doyle, Brock, and Ayer | |
2010-04-30 | House proposal of amendment not concurred in; Committee of Conference requested, on motion of Senator White | |
2010-04-30 | New Business/House Proposal of Amendment | |
2010-04-29 | House Proposal of Amendment | |
2010-04-28 | House message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment | |
2010-04-28 | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Komline of Dorset | |
2010-04-28 | Read Third time and Passed in Concurrence with Proposal of Amendment | |
2010-04-27 | Third Reading Ordered | |
2010-04-27 | Report of Committee on Government Operations and Appropriations agreed to. | |
2010-04-27 | Rep. Crawford of Burke, recommended for the committee on Government Operations | |
2010-04-27 | Rep. Evans of Essex reported for the committee on Government Operations | |
2010-04-27 | Read Second Time | |
2010-04-14 | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a) | |
2009-05-01 | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Government Operations | |
2009-05-01 | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Shumlin | |
2009-05-01 | Read 3rd time & passed | |
2009-05-01 | Rules suspended & bill placed on all remaining stages of passage, on motion of Senator Shumlin | |
2009-05-01 | 3rd reading ordered | |
2009-05-01 | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations, as amended, agreed to | |
2009-05-01 | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations amended as recommended by Committee on Appropriations | |
2009-05-01 | Reported favorably by Senator Kitchel for Committee on Appropriations with recommendation of amendment | |
2009-05-01 | Reported favorably by Senator Brock for Committee on Government Operations with recommendation of amendment | |
2009-05-01 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-01 | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Appropriations | |
2009-05-01 | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations | |
2009-05-01 | New Business/Second Reading | |
2009-04-30 | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Appropriations | |
2009-04-30 | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations | |
2009-04-30 | Second Reading | |
2009-04-10 | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31 | |
2009-04-10 | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onGovernment Operations | |
2009-04-10 | Second Reading | |
2009-02-19 | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Government Operations |