VT S0095 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-05 - Signed by Governor on May 17, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-05 - Signed by Governor on May 17, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Employment Decisions Based On Credit Information, Allowing School Employees To Be Paid Wages Over The Course Of A Year, And Union Organizing
Title
An Act Relating To Employment Decisions Based On Credit Information, Allowing School Employees To Be Paid Wages Over The Course Of A Year, And Union Organizing
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-05 | Signed by Governor on May 17, 2012 | |
2012-05-05 | Rules suspended & ordered delivered to Governor forthwith, on motion of Senator Campbell | |
2012-05-05 | As passed by Senate and House | |
2012-05-05 | House proposal of amendment concurred in on roll call requested by Senator Campbell, Passed -- Needed 14 of 26 to Pass -- Yeas = 20, Nays = 6 | |
2012-05-05 | Motion agreed to | |
2012-05-05 | Motion by Senator Sears to suspend Rule 73 to allow reconsideration of previous vote taken | |
2012-05-05 | Senator McCormack explained vote | |
2012-05-05 | House proposal of amendment concurred in on roll call requested by Senator Campbell, Passed -- Needed 14 of 26 to Pass -- Yeas = 17, Nays = 9 | |
2012-05-05 | House proposal of amendment; text | |
2012-05-05 | Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment | |
2012-05-03 | Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment | |
2012-05-01 | Entered on Notice Calendar | |
2012-05-01 | House Proposal of Amendment | |
2012-04-30 | House message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment | |
2012-04-30 | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Savage of Swanton | |
2012-04-30 | Read Third time and Passed in Concurrence with Proposal of Amendment | |
2012-04-30 | Rep. Olsen of Jamaica moved to commit the bill to the Committee on General, Housing and Military Affairs which was disagreed to | |
2012-04-30 | Amendment as offered by Rep. Edwards of Brattleboro agreed to | |
2012-04-30 | Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 67 of 133 to Pass -- Yeas = 50, Nays = 83 | |
2012-04-30 | Amendment as offered by Rep. Olsen of Jamaica disagreed to | |
2012-04-30 | Amendment as offered by Rep. Olsen of Jamaica disagreed to | |
2012-04-30 | Rep. Dickinson of St. Albans Town and Greshin of Warren moved to amend the House proposal of amendment which was agreed to | |
2012-04-30 | Amendment as offered by Rep. Wilson of Manchester agreed to | |
2012-04-28 | Third Reading Ordered | |
2012-04-28 | Proposal of Amendment of the Committee on General, Housing and Military Affairs agreed to | |
2012-04-28 | Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 57 of 113 to Pass -- Yeas = 94, Nays = 19 | |
2012-04-28 | Second instance of amendment agreed to | |
2012-04-28 | Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 58 of 115 to Pass -- Yeas = 80, Nays = 35 | |
2012-04-28 | First Instance of amendment agreed to | |
2012-04-28 | Rep. Lewis of Derby moved to postpone action until 4/30/12 which was disagreed to | |
2012-04-28 | Amendment as offered by Rep. Olsen of Jamaica disagreed to | |
2012-04-28 | Amendment as offered by Rep. Pugh of South Burlington withdrawn | |
2012-04-28 | Rep. Pugh of South Burlington moved to amend the recommendation of amendment offered by Rep. Head of South Burlington | |
2012-04-28 | Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 63 of 124 to Pass -- Yeas = 24, Nays = 100 | |
2012-04-28 | Rep. Fagan of Rutland City moved to commit the bill to the Committee on General, Housing and Military Affairs which was disagreed to | |
2012-04-28 | Amendment as offered by Rep. Head of South Burlington agreed to | |
2012-04-28 | Rep. Olsen of Jamaica asked that the question be divided | |
2012-04-28 | Amendment as offered by Rep. Wilson of Manchester withdrawn | |
2012-04-28 | Rep. Wilson of Manchester, Greshin of Warren, and Olsen of Jamaica moved to amend the bill | |
2012-04-28 | Amendment as offered by Rep. Donahue of Northfield withdrawn | |
2012-04-27 | Rep. Rep. Moran of Wardsboro reported for the committee on General, Housing and Military Affairs | |
2012-04-28 | Read Second Time | |
2012-01-04 | Committed to Committee on General, Housing and Military Affairs by motion of Rep. Turner of Milton | |
2011-05-04 | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Rules | |
2011-05-03 | Read 3rd time & passed | |
2011-05-03 | Rules suspended & bill placed on all remaining stages of passage, on motion of Senator Campbell | |
2011-05-03 | 3rd reading ordered on roll call, requested by Senator Sears, Passed -- Needed 16 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 29, Nays = 1 | |
2011-05-03 | Roll Call, requested by Senator Illuzzi, Failed -- Needed 16 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 7, Nays = 23 | |
2011-05-03 | Motion disagreed to | |
2011-05-03 | Senator Sears moved to strike out Sec. 6 of the bill | |
2011-05-03 | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance agreed to on Amendment #3 | |
2011-05-03 | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance agreed to on Amendments #1, 2 & 4 | |
2011-05-03 | Question on Finance amendment #3 divided on request of Senator Galbraith | |
2011-05-03 | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator McCormack for Committee on Finance | |
2011-05-03 | Unfinished Business/Committee Bill for Second Reading | |
2011-05-02 | Unfinished Business/Committee Bill for Second Reading | |
2011-04-29 | Recommendation of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Illuzzi | |
2011-04-29 | Unfinished Business/Committee Bill for Second Reading | |
2011-04-28 | Unfinished Business/Committee Bill for Second Reading | |
2011-04-27 | Unfinished Business/Committee Bill for Second Reading | |
2011-04-26 | Unfinished Business/Second Reading | |
2011-04-25 | Unfinished Business/Second Reading | |
2011-04-22 | New Business/Second Reading | |
2011-04-21 | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onFinance | |
2011-04-21 | Entered on Notice Calendar | |
2011-03-17 | Committed to Committee on Finance on motion of Senator Campbell | |
2011-03-17 | New Business/Committee Bill for Second Reading | |
2011-03-16 | Committee Bill for Second Reading | |
2011-03-15 | Committee bill read first time & placed on Notice Calendar per Senate Rule 48 |